Villar v. Massachusetts Department of Correction et al
Plaintiff: Alexander Villar
Defendant: Steven Silva, John Doe I, Thomas Turco, Massachusetts Department of Correction and John Doe III
Case Number: 1:2020cv12268
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Alexander Villar (Vieira, Leonardo)
February 3, 2021 Filing 9 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(PSSA, 5)
February 3, 2021 Filing 8 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE "This action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. On January 5, 2021, the Court ordered that Villar show cause why the action was not barred by the applicable statute of limitations. ECF No. 4. The Court mailed a copy of the Order to Villar. On January 6, 2021 a document previously mailed to Villar was entered on the docket as returned as undeliverable, bearing the word "released." ECF No. 6 at 2. On January 20, 2021, the Court's January 5, 2021 order was returned to the Court as undeliverable, and also written on the envelope was the term "released." ECF No. 7 at 1. The Court is separately informed that Villar was in fact released from Souza-Baranowski Correctional Center. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.5(h) a pro se litigant is required to provide an updated address to the Court within 14 days of a change of address. The Court has received no further communications from Villar or an updated address. The Clerk is directed to enter a separate order of dismissal without prejudice." (PSSA, 5)
January 20, 2021 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Alexander Villar (Vieira, Leonardo)
January 5, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE: re payment of fee (prisoner filer) issued to the Treasurer at MCI Shirley (PSSA, 5)
January 5, 2021 Filing 4 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (PSSA, 5)
January 4, 2021 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Alexander Villar (Vieira, Leonardo)
December 22, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alexander Villar. (Attachments: #1 inmate statement)(Castilla, Francis)
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Alexander Villar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villar v. Massachusetts Department of Correction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Turco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Villar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?