Matthews v. Prudential Insurance Company Of America et al
Plaintiff: Lynne M. Matthews
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company Of America, State Street Corporation Employee Benefit Plan, State Street Corporation and STATE STREET BANK AND TRUST COMPANY LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN
Case Number: 1:2020cv12313
Filed: December 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lynne M. Matthews. STATE STREET BANK AND TRUST COMPANY LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN waiver sent on 2/1/2021, answer due 4/2/2021. (Feigenbaum, Jonathan)
February 2, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lynne M. Matthews. State Street Corporation waiver sent on 2/1/2021, answer due 4/2/2021. (Feigenbaum, Jonathan)
February 2, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lynne M. Matthews. State Street Corporation Employee Benefit Plan waiver sent on 2/1/2021, answer due 4/2/2021. (Feigenbaum, Jonathan)
February 2, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lynne M. Matthews. Prudential Insurance Company Of America waiver sent on 2/1/2021, answer due 4/2/2021. (Feigenbaum, Jonathan)
January 4, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Warnock, Douglas)
January 4, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
December 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8574014 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Lynne M. Matthews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 category form)(Feigenbaum, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthews v. Prudential Insurance Company Of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street Corporation Employee Benefit Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE STREET BANK AND TRUST COMPANY LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynne M. Matthews
Represented By: Jonathan M. Feigenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?