U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSRMF MH Master Participation Trust II v. Coffin et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Defendant: Richard J Coffin
Interested Party: Bank of America, National Association
Case Number: 1:2020cv40106
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 15 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Hourihan, Lisa)
October 22, 2020 Filing 14 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Default Judgment (Hourihan, Lisa)
October 1, 2020 Filing 13 Proposed Document(s) submitted by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. Document received: Proposed Default Judgment. (Longoria, Reneau)
October 1, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Richard J Coffin and Bank of America NA Default Judgment. (Longoria, Reneau)
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Richard J Coffin and Bank of America NA by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Longoria, Reneau)
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment re #9 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default. (Currie, Haley)
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Richard J Coffin. (Currie, Haley)
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 Request for notice of default by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. . (Longoria, Reneau)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Richard J Coffin served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Longoria, Reneau)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Richard J Coffin. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Danieli, Chris)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from Central Division (Worcester) on 08/25/2020 Case Number 4:20-cv-40106. (Danieli, Chris)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 Case transferred to Eastern Division (Boston). (Burgos, Sandra)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSRMF MH Master Participation Trust II. (Longoria, Reneau)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard J Coffin Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8386771 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSRMF MH Master Participation Trust II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through K, #2 Category Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Longoria, Reneau)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSRMF MH Master Participation Trust II v. Coffin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Reneau J. Longoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J Coffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bank of America, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?