Stoute v. Cone et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Stoute
Defendant: William G. Young, Francesca L Cone, Gareth Notis, Steven Seballa, City of Everett, Steven A Mazzie, City of Malden, Morrison Mahoney LLP, Mike Hogan, Richard Ditrapano and Alex Viera
Case Number: 1:2021cv10035
Filed: January 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
2 Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2021 Filing 16 Copy re 15 Order and docket sheet mailed to Stephen Stoute on 2/23/21. (Lara, Miguel)
February 23, 2021 Filing 15 Chief District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. "No cause having been shown, the Plaintiff Stephen Stoute is hereby enjoined from commencing any actions in this Court, pro se, against any judicial officer, court employee, or attorney without prior approval of a Judge of this Court." (Lara, Miguel)
February 10, 2021 Filing 14 Copy re #12 Order Dismissing Case, #11 Order on Report and Recommendations, and docket sheet, mailed to Stephen Stoute on 2/10/2021. (Lara, Miguel)
February 9, 2021 Filing 13 Set Deadlines: Show Cause Response due by 2/19/2021. (Lara, Miguel)
February 9, 2021 Filing 12 Chief District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr: ORDER DISMISSING CASE entered. (Lara, Miguel)
February 9, 2021 Filing 11 Chief District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr: ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS entered re #8 Report and Recommendations.1. The Court adopts the Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. 2. The Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915(e)(2)(B). 3. The Plaintiff shall show cause within 10 days why he should not be enjoined from commencing any actions in this Court, pro se, against any judicial officer, court employee, or attorney without prior approval of a Judge of this Court. Failure to timely file a response to the show cause will result in the injunction to issue. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Report and Recommendation issued by M.J. Almond)(Lara, Miguel)
February 3, 2021 Filing 10 Letter/request from Stephen Stoute re Request for Documents. (Lara, Miguel)
January 20, 2021 Filing 9 Copy re #8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Stephen Stoute, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Stephen Stoute mailed to Stephen Stoute on 1/20/2021. (Lara, Miguel)
January 20, 2021 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond: REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS entered re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and #1 Complaint. Recommendation: "Plaintiff's Applications to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees (ECF Nos. #2 ) are GRANTED. However, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915(e)(2)(B), I further recommend that Plaintiff's Complaint be DISMISSED." (Objections to R&R due by 2/3/2021)(Lara, Miguel)
January 15, 2021 Filing 7 Chief District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond Referred for: Events Only (e). Motions referred: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Lara, Miguel) Motions referred to Lincoln D. Almond.
January 14, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Reassignment. Chief District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Danieli, Chris)
January 12, 2021 Filing 5 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: IT IS ORDERED, with the concurrence of the Honorable John J. McConnell, Jr., Chief Judge of the United States District Court for the District of Rhode Island, that United States Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond is hereby designated to perform any and all judicial duties designated under 28 U.S.C. 636, subsections (a), (b), and (c), on an as needed basis, in the District of Massachusetts during the pendency of this case.(adminn, )
January 12, 2021 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF DISTRICT JUDGE FOR SERVICE IN ANOTHER DISTRICT WITHIN THE CIRCUIT. John J. McConnell, Jr., United States Chief District Judge for the District of Rhode Island, is designated to sit upon the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts as to Stoute v. Cone, et al., Case No. 21-10035.(adminn, )
January 7, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
January 6, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stephen Stoute.(Castilla, Francis)
January 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Stephen Stoute. (Attachments: #1 Supplement complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stoute v. Cone et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William G. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francesca L Cone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gareth Notis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Seballa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven A Mazzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Malden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morrison Mahoney LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Ditrapano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Viera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Stoute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?