Miranda v. Rodrigues
Petitioner: Christian Miranda
Respondent: Michael Rodrigues
Case Number: 1:2021cv10040
Filed: January 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Filing 17 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. CLOSING ORDER DISMISSING CASE.(Montes, Mariliz)
March 1, 2021 Filing 16 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered.Respondent's motion to dismiss (Doc. No. 12) is ALLOWED, and Miranda's federal habeas petition is DISMISSED. A copy of this Order has been mailed to the Plaintiff. (Montes, Mariliz)
January 29, 2021 Filing 15 DOCKET SHEET sent to Petitioner. (Montes, Mariliz)
January 29, 2021 Filing 14 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 MOTION For Relief from the Conference Requirement in Local Rule 7.1.(Montes, Mariliz)
January 28, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Michael Rodrigues. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Bocian, Thomas)
January 28, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Michael Rodrigues.(Bocian, Thomas)
January 28, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Order to Relieve Parties of Conference Requirements in Local Rule 7.1 by Michael Rodrigues.(Bocian, Thomas)
January 28, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Bocian on behalf of Michael Rodrigues (Bocian, Thomas)
January 28, 2021 Filing 8 Set Deadlines: Answer to petition due by 2/5/2021. (Montes, Mariliz)
January 19, 2021 Filing 7 Return receipt received for certified mail sent to Attorney General for the District of MA: Delivered on 1/11/2021 (Montes, Mariliz)
January 15, 2021 Filing 10 Return receipt received for certified mail sent to Respondent: Delivered on 1/13/2021 (Montes, Mariliz)
January 8, 2021 Filing 6 Copy re #5 Service Order - 2254 Petition, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) and #2 Memorandum of Law mailed to Respondent and Attorney General for the District of MA on 1/8/2021 via first class mail and certified mail (Attorney General: tracking order # 70123050000072563571 and Respondent, Michael Rodrigues: tracking order # 70123050000072563588) (Montes, Mariliz)
January 8, 2021 Filing 5 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2254 Petition. Order entered pursuant to R.4 of the Rules governing Section 2254 cases for service on respondents. Answer/responsive pleading due w/in 21 days of receipt of this order. (Montes, Mariliz)
January 8, 2021 Filing 4 Filing fee/payment: $ 5.00, receipt number 1BST083100 for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (Barbosa, Nilsa)
January 7, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
January 7, 2021 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Christian Miranda. (Castilla, Francis)
January 7, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254, filed by Christian Miranda.(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miranda v. Rodrigues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christian Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Rodrigues
Represented By: Thomas E. Bocian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?