CitiMortgage, Inc. v. Russo et al
Plaintiff: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Defendant: John P. Russo, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and Commonwealth of Massachusetts - Department of Revenue
Case Number: 1:2021cv10088
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE Disclaimer of Interest by Commonwealth of Massachusetts - Department of Revenue (McAuliffe, Eileen) (Main Document 20 replaced on 3/19/2021) (Kelly, Danielle). Modified on 3/19/2021: Removed blank pages from document; Corrected docket text (Kelly, Danielle).
March 8, 2021 Filing 19 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Scheduling Conference held on 3/8/2021. Case called. Court had colloquy with counsel. Counsel reported that Initial Disclosures had been served. Plaintiff shall either file stipulation or motion for default re: John P. Russo. Proposed dates adopted. Plaintiff to make determination in regard to seeking fees in 1 week and shall notify the government. Status Conference set for 5/17/2021 02:15 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Indira Talwani. Scheduling Order to follow. The Status Conference may be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Court Reporter: Robert Paschal at rwp.reporter@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Steven G. Manchini, Joseph M. Kaufman, Eileen Ryan McAuliffe) (MacDonald, Gail)
March 5, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE re #6 Notice of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 3/8/2021 03:15 PM. This hearing/conference will not be conducted by telephone and will instead be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.(MacDonald, Gail)
February 26, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by United States of America. (Kaufman, Joseph)
February 26, 2021 Filing 16 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Kaufman, Joseph)
February 16, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Kaufman, Joseph)
February 8, 2021 Filing 14 STATE COURT Record. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record)(Kaufman, Joseph)
February 4, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed John P. Russo served on 12/23/2020, answer due 1/13/2021. (Manchini, Steven)
February 1, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 16.1(d)(3) by Eileen Ryan McAuliffe on behalf of Commonwealth of Massachusetts - Department of Revenue by on behalf of Commonwealth of Massachusetts - Department of Revenue.(McAuliffe, Eileen) (Modified on 2/2/2021: Main Document 12 replaced - removed blank page; Corrected docket text) (Kelly, Danielle).
January 25, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED Certificate of Service by Commonwealth of Massachusetts - Department of Revenue. Amendment to #7 Answer to Complaint . (McAuliffe, Eileen) Modified on 1/26/2021: Corrected docket text (Kelly, Danielle).
January 25, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Eileen Ryan McAuliffe on behalf of Commonwealth of Massachusetts - Department of Revenue (McAuliffe, Eileen)
January 22, 2021 Filing 9 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Commonwealth of Massachusetts - Department of Revenue.(McAuliffe, Eileen) (Main Document 9 replaced on 1/25/2021 - removed blank page) (Kelly, Danielle).
January 22, 2021 Filing 8 EXHIBIT by Commonwealth of Massachusetts - Department of Revenue. (McAuliffe, Eileen)
January 22, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Commonwealth of Massachusetts - Department of Revenue.(McAuliffe, Eileen) (Main Document 7 replaced on 1/22/2021 - removed blank page) (Kelly, Danielle).
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 3/8/2021 03:15 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Indira Talwani. Counsel for the plaintiff(s) is responsible for ensuring that all parties and/or their attorneys who have not filed an answer or appearance with the court are notified of the date of the scheduling conference. (Teleconference # 888-808-6929 access code: 8523158.) (MacDonald, Gail)
January 20, 2021 Filing 5 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER ALLOWING #2 Motion for Extension of Time to March 2, 2021 to File Answer. (Kelly, Danielle)
January 19, 2021 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Pacho, Arnold)
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to March 2, 2021 to File Answer by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Kaufman, Joseph)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Fee Status: US Government) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit Complaint in Middlesex Superior Court, #4 Exhibit Summons in Middlesex Superior Court, #5 Exhibit Civil Action Sheet in Middlesex Superior Court, #6 Exhibit Service record in Middlesex Superior Court)(Kaufman, Joseph) Modified docket text on 1/19/2021 (Pacho, Arnold).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CitiMortgage, Inc. v. Russo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Steven G. Manchini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P. Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Joseph M. Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Massachusetts - Department of Revenue
Represented By: Eileen Ryan McAuliffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?