Smith v. Cummings et al
Plaintiff: Thomas M Smith
Defendant: Montigny, David Cahoon, James M. Cummings and Scott Hennessey
Case Number: 1:2021cv10124
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thomas M Smith. (Baker, Casey)
February 18, 2021 Filing 7 Mail sent to Thomas M. Smith Returned as Undeliverable. (Baker, Casey)
February 11, 2021 Filing 6 Copy re #4 Order on Motion to Proceed IFP and blank copy of IFP Form mailed to Thomas Smith on 2/11/2021. (Baker, Casey)
February 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Thomas M Smith. (Baker, Casey)
January 25, 2021 Filing 4 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. Procedural Order regarding resolution of filling fee. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff must respond within 21 days. (Castilla, Francis)
January 25, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thomas M Smith.(Castilla, Francis)
January 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Thomas M Smith. (Attachments: #1 list, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 envelope)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Cummings et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montigny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Cahoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Hennessey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas M Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?