Dowds v. Alves
Petitioner: ROY C DOWDS and Roy C. Dowds
Respondent: Superintendent Nelson B Alves and Nelson B Alves
Case Number: 1:2021cv10133
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Judith G Dein
Referring Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Filing 11 SET DEADLINES AS TO: Answer/Response re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254 due by 5/3/2021. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
March 1, 2021 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED #9 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to file answer or otherwise respond. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
February 26, 2021 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to May 3, 2021 to file answer or otherwise respond by Nelson B Alves.(Granik, Maria)
February 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria Granik on behalf of Nelson B Alves (Granik, Maria)
February 16, 2021 Filing 7 SET DEADLINES AS TO: Memorandum and Appendix re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254 due by 6/28/2021. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
February 16, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Memorandum and Appendix. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
February 10, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2254 Petition. Order entered pursuant to R.4 of the Rules governing Section 2254 cases for service on respondents. Answer/responsive pleading due w/in 21 days of receipt of this order. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
January 29, 2021 Filing 4 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein Referred for: Full Pretrial, R&R on Dispositive Motions (ptd). Motions referred: #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to 06/28/2021 to File Memorandum and Appendix. (Baker, Casey) Motions referred to Judith G. Dein.
January 28, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to 06/28/2021 to File Memorandum and Appendix by Roy C. Dowds.(Nathanson, David)
January 28, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
January 27, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 0101-8611060 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid., filed by ROY C DOWDS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Nathanson, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/28/2021: #3 Exhibit) (Kelly, Danielle). (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/28/2021) (Kelly, Danielle).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dowds v. Alves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Superintendent Nelson B Alves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nelson B Alves
Represented By: Maria Granik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ROY C DOWDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roy C. Dowds
Represented By: David J. Nathanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?