Generate IP Holdings LLC et al v. Generate Biomedicines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Generate Life Sciences Inc. and Generate IP Holdings LLC
Defendant: Generate Biomedicines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv10179
Filed: February 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Strand on behalf of Generate Biomedicines, Inc. (Strand, John)
March 8, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re #7 Stipulation filed by Generate IP Holdings LLC, Generate Life Sciences Inc. APPROVED. The time within which Defendant may move, answer, counterclaim, or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this matter is extended through and including May 4, 2021. (Hourihan, Lisa)
March 5, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Confirming Service of Process and Extending Time to Respond by Generate IP Holdings LLC, Generate Life Sciences Inc.. (Ciampa, Thomas)
February 3, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Generate Biomedicines, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
February 3, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
February 3, 2021 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING TRADEMARK. (Burgos, Sandra)
February 2, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Generate Life Sciences Inc. identifying Corporate Parent GI Generate Intermediate LLC for Generate Life Sciences Inc... (Ciampa, Thomas)
February 2, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Generate IP Holdings LLC identifying Corporate Parent California Cryobank LLC for Generate IP Holdings LLC.. (Ciampa, Thomas)
February 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Generate Biomedicines, Inc. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8618745 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Generate IP Holdings LLC, Generate Life Sciences Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Civil Action Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Category Form, #4 Exhibit AO 120)(Ciampa, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Generate IP Holdings LLC et al v. Generate Biomedicines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Generate Life Sciences Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M. Ciampa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Generate IP Holdings LLC
Represented By: Thomas M. Ciampa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Generate Biomedicines, Inc.
Represented By: John L. Strand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?