Sustainable Fisheries Coalition v. Coggins
Plaintiff: Sustainable Fisheries Coalition
Defendant: The Honorable Wynn Coggins
Case Number: 1:2021cv10204
Filed: February 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE by Wynn Coggins of Filing the Administrative Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Exhibit B - Index, #3 Part 1 (AR1 through AR1154), #4 Part 2 (AR1155 through AR2083), #5 Part 3 (AR2084 through AR3382), #6 Part 4 (AR3383 through AR4145), #7 Part 5 (AR4146 through AR5294), #8 Part 6 (AR5295 through AR6424), #9 Part 7 (AR6425 through AR7137), #10 Part 8 (AR7138 through AR7915), #11 Part 9 (AR7916 through AR8991), #12 Part 10 (AR8992 through AR9876), #13 Part 11 (AR9877 through AR10576), #14 Part 12 (AR10577 through AR11344), #15 Part 13 (AR11345 through AR12399), #16 Part 14 (AR12400 through AR13263), #17 Part 15 (AR13264 through AR14203), #18 Part 16 (AR14204 through AR15171), #19 Part 17 (AR15172 through AR15694), #20 Part 18 (AR15695 through AR16337), #21 Part 19 (AR16338 through AR17461), #22 Part 20 (AR17462 through AR19093), #23 Part 21 (AR19094 through AR21421), #24 Part 22 (AR21422 through AR24152), #25 Part 23 (AR21453 through AR25271))(Norway, Robert)
April 2, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Wynn Coggins.(Norway, Robert)
April 2, 2021 Filing 18 Set Deadlines: Administrative record due by 4/5/2021. (Montes, Mariliz)
April 2, 2021 Filing 17 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The Court ADOPTS AND ALLOWS the parties' #16 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. Wynn Coggins' answer to complaint due 4/2/2021. Administrative record to be filed by 4/5/2021. Dispositive motions due by 5/19/2021; opposition/ cross motions due by 7/2/2021; Replies due by 7/30/2021; Sur-replies due by 8/27/2021.(Montes, Mariliz)
March 31, 2021 Filing 16 First JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference and case management. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Gehan, Shaun)
March 29, 2021 Filing 15 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Sustainable Fisheries Coalition. Amendment to #6 Summons Issued, Attorney General. (Gehan, Shaun)
March 24, 2021 Filing 14 Set Deadlines: Parties' proposed briefing schedule due by 3/31/2021. (Montes, Mariliz)
March 24, 2021 Filing 13 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion Motion to Expedite Consideration and Resolution. The parties shall propose a briefing schedule within seven days (3/31/2021). (Montes, Mariliz)
March 23, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of #11 MOTION to Expedite Consideration filed by Sustainable Fisheries Coalition. (Montes, Mariliz)
March 23, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Expedite Consideration by Sustainable Fisheries Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Gehan, Shaun) Modified on 3/24/2021 to detach memorandum in support and re-docket as a new entry (see doc. 12)(Montes, Mariliz).
March 10, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Norway on behalf of Wynn Coggins (Norway, Robert)
February 25, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Gehan, Shaun)
February 25, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Wynn Coggins served on 2/17/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (Gehan, Shaun)
February 15, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Sustainable Fisheries Coalition. US Attorney served on 2/10/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (Gehan, Shaun) Modified on 2/16/2021 to correct served party.(Montes, Mariliz).
February 5, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle)
February 5, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
February 5, 2021 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #1 Complaint, by Sustainable Fisheries Coalition. (Gehan, Shaun)
February 5, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents - Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet. (Kelly, Danielle)
February 5, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sustainable Fisheries Coalition. (Gehan, Shaun)
February 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Petition for Review of Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against Wynn Coggins Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8624392 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Sustainable Fisheries Coalition. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Gehan, Shaun) Modified on 2/5/2021: Corrected docket text (Kelly, Danielle).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sustainable Fisheries Coalition v. Coggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Honorable Wynn Coggins
Represented By: Robert M. Norway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sustainable Fisheries Coalition
Represented By: Shaun M Gehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?