Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S v. General Electric Co. et al
Plaintiff: SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY A/S
Defendant: GE RENEWABLES NORTH AMERICA, LLC and General Electric Co
Case Number: 1:2021cv10216
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Referring Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 145
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Filing 129 DECLARATION re #127 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff SGRE's Production of Emails by General Electric Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(McCullough, Colleen)
October 12, 2021 Filing 128 MEMORANDUM in Support re #127 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff SGRE's Production of Emails filed by General Electric Co. (McCullough, Colleen)
October 12, 2021 Filing 127 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff SGRE's Production of Emails by General Electric Co.(McCullough, Colleen)
October 11, 2021 Filing 126 MEMORANDUM in Support re #125 MOTION to Compel filed by SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY A/S. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Bell, Cory)
October 11, 2021 Filing 125 MOTION to Compel by SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY A/S.(Bell, Cory)
October 4, 2021 Filing 124 Response by General Electric Co to #121 Brief . (Tompros, Louis)
October 2, 2021 Filing 123 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #120 Declaration, #122 Response, #121 Brief, #119 Brief. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office Attention Matthew Paine - Docket Clerk - Judge Young. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Paine, Matthew)
October 1, 2021 Filing 122 Response by SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY A/S to #120 Declaration, #119 Brief GE Supplemental Claim Construction Brief. (Bell, Cory)
September 30, 2021 Filing 121 BRIEF by SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY A/S Supplemental Claim Construction Brief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bell, Cory)
September 30, 2021 Filing 120 DECLARATION re #119 Brief by General Electric Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McCullough, Colleen)
September 30, 2021 Filing 119 BRIEF by General Electric Co (Supplemental Claim Construction Brief). (Tompros, Louis)
September 29, 2021 Filing 118 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #115 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory to Denmark, by General Electric Co. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
September 28, 2021 Filing 117 DECLARATION re #116 Memorandum in Support of Motion by General Electric Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Kieckhafer, Katherine)
September 28, 2021 Filing 116 MEMORANDUM in Support re #115 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory to Denmark, filed by General Electric Co. (Kieckhafer, Katherine)
September 28, 2021 Filing 115 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory to Denmark, by General Electric Co.(Kieckhafer, Katherine)
September 21, 2021 Filing 114 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Coppola, Katelyn)
September 21, 2021 Filing 113 Transcript of Markman Hearing held on September 16, 2021, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com. Redaction Request due 10/12/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/22/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/20/2021. (Coppola, Katelyn)
September 16, 2021 Filing 112 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Markman Hearing held on 9/16/2021. The Court announces that there are seven (7) terms to be construed and enters an oral order on the record as to all but the second disputed term, which is taken under advisement. See transcript for details. Further supplemental briefing to be filed within two (2) weeks. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: Attorneys Gannon and Nelson for the plaintiff and Attorneys Tompros, Bertulli and McCullough for the defendants) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
September 16, 2021 Filing 111 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #110 Motion to Amend #71 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference Scheduling Order by SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY A/S. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
September 15, 2021 Filing 110 MOTION to Amend #71 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference Scheduling Order by SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY A/S.(Bell, Cory)
September 13, 2021 Filing 109 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #108 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Elizabeth N. Sneitzer and Daniel J. Goettle. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew)
September 10, 2021 Filing 108 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Elizabeth N. Sneitzer and Daniel J. Goettle Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-8941887 by SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY A/S. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Bell, Cory)
September 2, 2021 Filing 107 MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Response Claim Construction Brief, by General Electric Co. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Corrected Response Claim Construction Brief)(Tompros, Louis)
September 2, 2021 Filing 106 NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by General Electric Co of the Technology Tutorial (Kieckhafer, Katherine)
September 1, 2021 Filing 105 Letter/request (non-motion) from Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S Submitting Technology Tutorial. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - SGRE Technology Tutorial)(Bell, Cory)
August 30, 2021 Filing 104 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Markman Hearing set for 9/16/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. Time change only.(Gaudet, Jennifer)
August 5, 2021 Filing 103 Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY A/S.(Bell, Cory)
August 4, 2021 Filing 102 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #101 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to September 1, 2021 to Submit Claim Construction Technology Tutorials. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
August 2, 2021 Filing 101 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to September 1, 2021 to Submit Claim Construction Technology Tutorials by SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY A/S.(Bell, Cory)
July 28, 2021 Filing 100 BRIEF by General Electric Co (Responsive Claim Construction Brief). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Tompros, Louis)
July 28, 2021 Filing 99 Reply to Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs by SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY A/S. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H, #2 Exhibit I)(Bell, Cory)
July 22, 2021 Filing 98 Second Amended ANSWER to #95 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY A/S by General Electric Co.(Tompros, Louis)
July 9, 2021 Filing 97 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Coppola, Katelyn)
July 9, 2021 Filing 96 Transcript of Motion to Stay held on May 13, 2021, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com. Redaction Request due 7/30/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/9/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/7/2021. (Coppola, Katelyn)
July 1, 2021 Filing 95 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT AND JURY DEMAND against General Electric Co, filed by SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY A/S. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Ex. C, #4 Ex. D, #5 Ex. E, #6 Ex. F, #7 Ex. G, #8 Ex. H)(Bell, Cory)
July 1, 2021 Filing 94 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY A/S by General Electric Co.(Tompros, Louis)
June 29, 2021 Filing 93 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #92 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Stephanie J. Nelson. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew)
June 29, 2021 Filing 92 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Stephanie J. Nelson Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8839276 by SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY A/S. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Stephanie J. Nelson)(Lipton, Alissa)
June 25, 2021 Filing 91 Markman Brief by SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY A/S. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - IPR2021-00722, Paper 1 at 25, #2 Ex. B - IPR2021-00723, Paper 1 at 22, #3 Ex. C - U.S. Patent No. 8,575,776, #4 Ex. D - U.S. Patent No. 9,279,413, #5 Ex. E - Joint Claim Construction Statement, #6 Ex. F - Declaration of Timothy L. Morse, #7 Ex. G - 413 patent prosecution history)(Bell, Cory)
June 25, 2021 Filing 90 Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs by General Electric Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Tompros, Louis)
June 21, 2021 Filing 89 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #85 Motion to Seal. (Paine, Matthew)
June 21, 2021 Filing 88 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #81 Motion to Seal. (Paine, Matthew)
June 21, 2021 Filing 87 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #84 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Paine, Matthew)
June 21, 2021 Filing 86 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #82 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Paine, Matthew)
June 18, 2021 Filing 85 MOTION to Seal Amended Complaint by SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY A/S.(Bell, Cory)
June 18, 2021 Filing 84 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint #1 Complaint, CORRECTED by SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY A/S. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(Bell, Cory) Modified on 6/20/2021 to Correct Docket Text and CM/ECF Filing Event As Counsel Filed the Motion Under the Wrong Event in CM/ECF (Paine, Matthew).
June 18, 2021 Filing 83 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint, by SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY A/S. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Bell, Cory)
June 17, 2021 Filing 82 MOTION for Leave to File (Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims and Supporting Documents Thereto) by General Electric Co. (Attachments: #1 (PROPOSED) Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims, #2 (PROPOSED) Declaration of Rauvin A. Johl in Support of Amended Answer, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8)(Tompros, Louis)
June 17, 2021 Filing 81 MOTION to Seal (Unopposed Motion to Seal Defendant's Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims and Exhibits to Rauvin A. Johl's Declaration Thereto) by General Electric Co.(Tompros, Louis)
June 15, 2021 Filing 80 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Markman Hearing set for 9/16/2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
June 11, 2021 Filing 79 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY A/S. (Bell, Cory)
May 13, 2021 Filing 78 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Motion Hearing held on 5/13/2021 by video re #72 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by General Electric Co, GE RENEWABLES NORTH AMERICA, LLC. After hearing arguments of counsel, the Court enters an order denying #72 Motion to Stay. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: Attorney Gannon for the plaintiff and Attorney Tompros for the defendants) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
May 10, 2021 Filing 77 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #72 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review : Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2021 at 12:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
April 26, 2021 Filing 76 NOTICE by General Electric Co of Filing Date (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition IPR2021-00722, #2 Exhibit B - Petition IPR2021-00723, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Date IPR2021-00722, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing Date IPR2021-00723)(Kieckhafer, Katherine)
April 20, 2021 Filing 75 Opposition re #72 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY A/S. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Bell, Cory)
April 12, 2021 Filing 74 Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim to Plaintiff's Complaint by SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY A/S.(Bell, Cory)
April 6, 2021 Filing 73 MEMORANDUM in Support re #72 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by GE RENEWABLES NORTH AMERICA, LLC, General Electric Co. (Kieckhafer, Katherine)
April 6, 2021 Filing 72 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review by GE RENEWABLES NORTH AMERICA, LLC, General Electric Co.(Kieckhafer, Katherine)
March 30, 2021 Filing 71 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference [REVISED]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E-Discovery Agreement, #2 Exhibit Proposed Protective Order)(Bell, Cory)
March 22, 2021 Filing 70 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY A/S by GE RENEWABLES NORTH AMERICA, LLC, General Electric Co.(Tompros, Louis)
March 19, 2021 Filing 69 STIPULATION Dismissing GE Renewables North America, LLC Pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by GE RENEWABLES NORTH AMERICA, LLC, General Electric Co. (Kieckhafer, Katherine)
March 16, 2021 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis W. Tompros on behalf of GE RENEWABLES NORTH AMERICA, LLC, General Electric Co (Tompros, Louis)
March 16, 2021 Filing 67 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered; PROTECTIVE ORDER. Nothing is to be filed under seal in Court pursuant to this order. It is not to be cited as a ground for sealing.(Gaudet, Jennifer)
March 16, 2021 Filing 66 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. The scheduling conference set for 3/167/2021 at 2:00 PM is hereby canceled in light of the Court's order on the parties joint statement. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
March 16, 2021 Filing 65 Set/Reset Hearings: Ready for Trial on 4/4/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
March 16, 2021 Filing 64 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #62 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. The proposed schedule is returned as too long a time frame. This case is placed on the running trial list for April 2022. A revised proposed schedule to be filed within two weeks. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
March 9, 2021 Filing 63 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Bell, Cory)
March 9, 2021 Filing 62 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E-Discovery Agreement, #2 Exhibit Proposed Protective Order)(Bell, Cory)
March 1, 2021 Filing 61 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #60 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Leif R. Sigmond, Jr., Michael D. Gannon; Douglas Rupert; Stephanie M. Hatzikyriakou and Robert W. Thielhelm, Jr.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew)
March 1, 2021 Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Leif R. Sigmond, Jr., Michael D. Gannon; Douglas Rupert; Stephanie M. Hatzikyriakou and Robert W. Thielhelm, Jr. Filing fee: $ 500, receipt number 0101-8657750 by SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY A/S. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Lipton, Alissa)
February 26, 2021 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Monica Grewal on behalf of GE RENEWABLES NORTH AMERICA, LLC, General Electric Co (Grewal, Monica)
February 26, 2021 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott W. Bertulli on behalf of GE RENEWABLES NORTH AMERICA, LLC, General Electric Co (Bertulli, Scott)
February 18, 2021 Filing 57 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 3/16/2021 at 2:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.(Gaudet, Jennifer)
February 18, 2021 Filing 56 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #55 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint; GE RENEWABLES NORTH AMERICA, LLC answer due 3/22/2021; General Electric Co answer due 3/22/2021. Scheduling conference to be set under separate notice. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
February 17, 2021 Filing 55 MOTION for Extension of Time to March 22, 2021 to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint and Request for Scheduling Conference (Unopposed) by GE RENEWABLES NORTH AMERICA, LLC, General Electric Co.(Howell-Walton, Gary)
February 17, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Cory C. Bell on behalf of SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY A/S (Bell, Cory)
February 17, 2021 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine P. Kieckhafer on behalf of GE RENEWABLES NORTH AMERICA, LLC, General Electric Co (Kieckhafer, Katherine)
February 12, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Rauvin A. Johl on behalf of GE RENEWABLES NORTH AMERICA, LLC, General Electric Co (Johl, Rauvin)
February 11, 2021 Filing 51 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Colleen M. McCullough (Withdrawal of Suzanne Barto Hill and Jason F. Bullinger) (McCullough, Colleen)
February 11, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Alissa K. Lipton on behalf of SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY A/S (Lipton, Alissa)
February 9, 2021 Filing 49 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge William G. Young added. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
February 9, 2021 Filing 48 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL.I hereby RECUSE from this case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 455(b)(4) and direct the clerk to reassign this case randomly to another district judge.(Montes, Mariliz)
February 9, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary B. Howell-Walton on behalf of GE RENEWABLES NORTH AMERICA, LLC, General Electric Co (Howell-Walton, Gary)
February 9, 2021 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen M. McCullough on behalf of GE RENEWABLES NORTH AMERICA, LLC, General Electric Co (McCullough, Colleen)
February 8, 2021 Filing 45 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris)
February 8, 2021 Filing 44 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:20-cv-02281.
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING #42 the Parties' Joint Motion to Transfer; DENYING AS MOOT #35 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue. The Clerk is directed to TRANSFER this matter to the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts, Boston Division, for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/4/2021. (APF)
February 2, 2021 Filing 42 Joint MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S. (Thielhelm, Robert)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial statement due by 1/6/2023, Jury Trial set for the MARCH 2023 TRIAL TERM, which commences on February 27, 2023, with a more precise trial date to follow. Conduct mediation hearing by 2/18/2022. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/13/2021. (CRB)
January 8, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE OF SELECTION of Mark C. Morril as mediator by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S. (Thielhelm, Robert)
December 21, 2020 Filing 39 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Thielhelm, Robert)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #36 the Parties' Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue, and to Conduct Limited Expedited Venue-Related Discovery. The Court confirms and adopts the Parties' stipulation and agreement as to the timing and limitations of the expedited venue-related discovery set forth in the Joint Motion. Plaintiff shall have up to and including the earlier of fourteen (14) days after the expedited venue discovery is completed or February 12, 2021 to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue. (Dkt. 35) Defendants are granted leave to file a reply not to exceed five (5) pages no later than the deadline set forth by the Parties in the Joint Motion. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/16/2020. (APF)
December 14, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of compliance by GE Renewables North America, LLC, General Electric Co. (Bullinger, Jason)
December 10, 2020 Filing 36 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #35 First MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue and Memorandum of Law in Support by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S. (Thielhelm, Robert) Modified on 12/11/2020 (TDC).
December 4, 2020 REFUND for duplicate payment. Receipt number 113A-17561852 refunded in the amount of $ 150.00 paid to Mildred Rios.. (NLC)
November 27, 2020 Filing 35 First MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue and Memorandum of Law in Support by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Shelling Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B Stalica Affidavit, #3 Exhibit C Summons, #4 Exhibit D Cost Manager Sales Offshore)(Hill, Suzanne) Modified on 11/30/2020 (TDC). Added MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case on 11/30/2020 (TDC).
November 10, 2020 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re: #13 by GE Renewables North America, LLC, General Electric Co. (Bullinger, Jason) Modified text on 11/12/2020 (LYB)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Defendants by Louis W. Tompros. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 11/6/2020. (DK)
November 5, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Louis W. Tompros to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17514821 for $150 by GE Renewables North America, LLC, General Electric Co. (Bullinger, Jason) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. Modified on 11/6/2020 (TDC).
November 5, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Frederick Bullinger on behalf of GE Renewables North America, LLC, General Electric Co. (Bullinger, Jason)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #29 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants shall have up to and including November 27, 2020 to file their answers or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/30/2020. (APF)
October 28, 2020 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by GE Renewables North America, LLC, General Electric Co. (Hill, Suzanne) Modified on 10/29/2020 (TDC). Modified on 10/29/2020 (TDC).
October 19, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of compliance by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S. (Rupert, Douglas) Modified on 10/20/2020 (TDC).
October 16, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #12 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S. Related case(s): no (Thielhelm, Robert)
October 16, 2020 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #13 Interested persons order by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S identifying Corporate Parent Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy S.A. for Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S. (Thielhelm, Robert) Modified on 10/19/2020 (TDC).
October 16, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of compliance by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S. (Rose, Harrison) Modified on 10/19/2020 (TDC).
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER granting #21 Plaintiff's Motion for Justin Donoho to Withdraw. Attorney Justin R. Donoho is terminated as counsel of record for Plaintiff and relieved of any further responsibility in this matter. Attorneys Sigmund, Jr., Gannon, Rupert, Rose, and Thielhelm, Jr. to remain counsel of record for Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 10/14/2020. (ACS)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Harrison Rose may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff, with Attorney Robert Thielhelm, Jr. designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements.Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 10/14/2020. (ACS)
October 13, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of compliance by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S (Gannon, Michael)
October 13, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Justin Donoho to Withdraw as Attorney by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S. (Thielhelm, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
October 13, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of compliance by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S (Sigmond, Leif)
October 13, 2020 Filing 19 PROOF of service by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S (Thielhelm, Robert)
October 13, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Harrison B. Rose to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17420976 for $150 by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S. (Thielhelm, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motions to Appear pro hac vice (Docs. 14-16). Attorneys Leif Sigmund, Jr., Michael Gannon, and Douglas Rupert may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff, with Attorney Robert Thielhelm, Jr. designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 10/5/2020. (ACS)
October 2, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Douglas Rupert to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17384876 for $150 by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S. (Thielhelm, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
October 2, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Michael D. Gannon to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17384834 for $150 by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S. (Thielhelm, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
October 2, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leif R. Sigmond, Jr. to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17384827 for $150 by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S. (Thielhelm, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/16/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/2/2020. (CRB)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/16/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/2/2020. (CRB)
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS issued as to GE Renewables North America, LLC, General Electric Co. (TDC)
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S. (Thielhelm, Robert)
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S. (Thielhelm, Robert)
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE to counsel Michael D. Gannon of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TDC)
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE to counsel Leif R. Sigmond, Jr. of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TDC)
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE to counsel Justin R. Donoho of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TDC)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel Harrison B. Rose of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TDC)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Douglas S. Rupert of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TDC)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H). (TDC)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:20-cv-2281-T-35SPF. (SJB)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement and Jury Demand against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17364299) filed by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thielhelm, Robert) Modified on 9/30/2020 (TDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S v. General Electric Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY A/S
Represented By: Douglas S. Rupert
Represented By: Justin R. Donoho
Represented By: Harrison B. Rose
Represented By: Michael D. Gannon
Represented By: Robert W. Thielhelm, Jr.
Represented By: Leif R. Sigmond, Jr.
Represented By: Stephanie M. Hatzikyriakou
Represented By: Alissa K. Lipton
Represented By: Cory C. Bell
Represented By: Stephanie J. Nelson
Represented By: Daniel J. Goettle
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Sneitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE RENEWABLES NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Represented By: Suzanne Barto Hill
Represented By: Jason Frederick Bullinger
Represented By: Colleen M. McCullough
Represented By: Scott W. Bertulli
Represented By: Louis W. Tompros
Represented By: Rauvin A. Johl
Represented By: Katherine P. Kieckhafer
Represented By: Monica Grewal
Represented By: Gary B. Howell-Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Co
Represented By: Louis W. Tompros
Represented By: Suzanne Barto Hill
Represented By: Jason Frederick Bullinger
Represented By: Colleen M. McCullough
Represented By: Scott W. Bertulli
Represented By: Rauvin A. Johl
Represented By: Katherine P. Kieckhafer
Represented By: Monica Grewal
Represented By: Gary B. Howell-Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?