Carrara v. Saul
Plaintiff: Timothy S Carrara
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv10239
Filed: February 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2021 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 4/12/2021 cancelled in light of the Procedural Order entered on 4/1/2021, D. #12 . (Currie, Haley) Modified on 4/5/2021: to adjust entry text (Currie, Haley).
April 1, 2021 Filing 12 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. Procedural Order re Social Security Action (Currie, Haley)
March 12, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case RE-Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
March 5, 2021 Filing 10 Refusal to CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Timothy S Carrara.. (Greenberg, Morris) Modified on 3/12/2021 (Putnam, Harold).
February 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis J. George on behalf of Andrew Saul (George, Louis)
February 23, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Timothy S Carrara. Andrew Saul served on 2/23/2021, answer due 3/16/2021. Acknowledgement filed by Timothy S Carrara. (Greenberg, Morris)
February 17, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Timothy S Carrara. Office of the Regional Chief Counsel - Social Security Administration served 3/8/21 (Greenberg, Morris) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/16/2021: #1 Certified Return Card) Entry modified to adjust docket text to reflect party served (Currie, Haley).
February 16, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 4/12/2021 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. ALL COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO APPEAR BY PHONE by calling 888-675-2535 approximately five minutes prior to the conference, using Access Code 6641794. If, for some reason, the call is disconnected, dial back in. NOTE that yours may not be the first case called, but please remain on the line until it is.(Putnam, Harold)
February 12, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. Procedural Order re Social Security Action (Currie, Haley)
February 12, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley)
February 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Currie, Haley)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Timothy S Carrara Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8634262 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Timothy S Carrara. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Category Form, #3 Summons (Atty Gen), #4 Summons (US Atty), #5 Summons (Commissioner))(Greenberg, Morris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carrara v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Louis J. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy S Carrara
Represented By: Morris Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Christopher A. Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?