Smith v. Lobur et al
Plaintiff: Steven L Smith
Defendant: Meredith Lobur, William Golden, Town Manager of the Township of Provincetown and Chief of Provincetown Police
Case Number: 1:2021cv10290
Filed: February 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2021 Filing 16 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Steven L. Smith (McDonagh, Christina)
March 30, 2021 Filing 15 Copies of all ECF attachments and Docket Sheet mailed to Steven L. Smith on 3/30/2021. (McDonagh, Christina)
March 29, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Steven L Smith (McDonagh, Christina)
March 18, 2021 Filing 13 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(PSSA, 3)
March 18, 2021 Filing 12 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. The Court hereby orders that the pending motions be terminated and that this action be DISMISSED. No filing fee is assessed.(PSSA, 3)
March 17, 2021 Filing 11 Exigent MOTION to Request Immediate Injunction/Relief from Plaintiff's Denial of Adequate access to Law Library and services/resources to represent himself in this action and prevent further retaliatory acts by Barnstable County Jail Officials by Steven L Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Letter)(McDonagh, Christina)
March 11, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Supplement Motions to Request Order of Injuction by Steven L Smith.(McDonagh, Christina) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2021: #1 Exhibit) (McDonagh, Christina).
March 11, 2021 Filing 9 Exigent MOTION in Support to Receive Court Order/Injunction to Stop/Prevent infringement of Plaintiff's Constitutional Right to Represent self with Exhibits to prove Defendants' Complicity to Violate his Civil Rights by Steven L Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McDonagh, Christina)
March 10, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint or to Include a demand for a Jury Trial by Steven L Smith.(McDonagh, Christina)
March 8, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Include parties to Lawsuit and to Request Exigent Court Order to Prevent the Defendants and Agents from Continuing to Violate his Constitutional Rights of due process and deprival of his Liberty and Infringement to represent self by Steven L Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Letter)(McDonagh, Christina)
March 3, 2021 Filing 6 Copy of docket sheet mailed to Steven L Smith, 716070. Barnstable County House of Correction,6000 Sheriff's Place,Bourne, MA 02532 on 3/3/2021. (Finn, Mary)
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Steven Smith by Steven L Smith. (McDonagh, Christina)
March 3, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Steven L Smith.(McDonagh, Christina)
February 19, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
February 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Steven L Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Baker, Casey)
February 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Steven L Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Baker, Casey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Lobur et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meredith Lobur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town Manager of the Township of Provincetown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief of Provincetown Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?