Barros v. Moniz
Petitioner: Jose Pedro Santos Barros
Respondent: Antone Moniz
Case Number: 1:2021cv10318
Filed: February 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2021 Filing 8 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. "The Court ALLOWS in part the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 (Dkt. 1). The Court orders that a bond hearing for Petitioner be held by the Boston Immigration Court within 10 days." (Baker, Casey)
March 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by Antone Moniz re #5 Service Order - 2241 Petition,, NOTICE OF INTENT NOT TO OPPOSE NEW BOND HEARING (Farquhar, Rayford)
February 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Rayford A. Farquhar on behalf of Antone Moniz (Farquhar, Rayford)
February 26, 2021 Filing 5 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. 1.The Clerk shall serve a copy of the petition on the Respondent and the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts. 2.The Respondent shall, within 7 days of the entry of this Order, file an answer or other responsive pleading. Petitioner shall file a reply brief within 7 days of the filing of Respondents brief. 3.In order to give the Court time to consider the matter, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the Respondent shall provide the Court with at least 48 hours advance notice of any scheduled removal of the Petitioner, and any scheduled transfer of the Petitioner out of the jurisdiction.(PSSA, 4)
February 26, 2021 Filing 4 Judge Patti B. Saris: STANDING ORDER entered on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. (Baker, Casey)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (Baker, Casey)
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
February 25, 2021 Filing 1 First PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 0101-8653910 Fee status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Jose Pedro Santos Barros. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Supplement Declaration, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D)(Pires, Manuel) Modified docket text on 2/25/2021 (Pacho, Arnold).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barros v. Moniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Pedro Santos Barros
Represented By: Manuel R. Pires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Antone Moniz
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?