Mellor et al v. Jetblue Airways Corporation
Plaintiff: David Mellor and Denise Mellor
Defendant: JetBlue Airways Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv10319
Filed: February 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2021 Filing 16 Judge Indira Talwani: SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Please see attached. SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES: Amendments to pleadings due June 30, 2021. Fact discovery to be completed by December 1, 2021. Plaintiffs' trial experts designated by December 31, 2021 and deposed by March 31, 2022. Defendants' trial experts designated by February 15, 2022 and deposed by May 15, 2022. Dispositive Motions due July 1, 2022. NOTICE OF HEARING: Status Conference set for December 7, 2021 at 2:30 p.m. in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Indira Talwani. (Kelly, Danielle)
April 7, 2021 Filing 15 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER striking Disclosure 12 . Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures must be provided to the other parties, but need not be filed on the docket. (Kelly, Danielle)
April 7, 2021 Filing 14 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered ALLOWING #11 Motion to Compel Witness Information. (Kelly, Danielle)
April 6, 2021 Filing 12 This document has been STRICKEN from the record pursuant to Electronic Order [#15]. Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by David Mellor, Denise Mellor.(Breakstone, Reza) Modified on 4/7/2021 (Kelly, Danielle).
April 6, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Compel Witness Information by David Mellor. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order re Witness Information)(Breakstone, Reza)
April 5, 2021 Filing 13 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Scheduling Conference held on 4/5/2021. Case called. Court had colloquy with counsel. Parties to jointly report to clerk any request for ADR. Proposed dates adopted. Scheduling Order to follow. Status Conference set for 12/7/2021 02:30 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Indira Talwani. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Court Reporter: Robert Paschal at rwp.reporter@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Marc Breakstone, Reza Breakstone, Steven E. Arnold) (MacDonald, Gail)
March 27, 2021 Filing 10 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(Arnold, Steven)
March 15, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by JetBlue Airways Corporation.(Arnold, Steven)
March 12, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Reza Breakstone on behalf of David Mellor, Denise Mellor (Breakstone, Reza)
March 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. SEE attached Notice. Scheduling Conference set for 4/5/2021 03:15 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail)
February 26, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Arnold, Steven)
February 26, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by JetBlue Airways Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Filing and Service (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A - Notice of Removal)(Arnold, Steven)
February 25, 2021 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Pacho, Arnold)
February 25, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
February 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E. Arnold on behalf of JetBlue Airways Corporation (Arnold, Steven)
February 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8654350 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Pleadings and Notices, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Local Category Form)(Arnold, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mellor et al v. Jetblue Airways Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Mellor
Represented By: Marc Breakstone
Represented By: Reza Breakstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Mellor
Represented By: Marc Breakstone
Represented By: Reza Breakstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JetBlue Airways Corporation
Represented By: Steven E. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?