St. Onge v. Curry College et al
Plaintiff: Natasha St. Onge
Defendant: Curry College and Nysha Sanchez
Case Number: 1:2021cv10321
Filed: February 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2021 Filing 10 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Curry College.(Sullivan, Kevin)
April 20, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Curry College.(Sullivan, Kevin)
April 9, 2021 Filing 8 Copy re 7 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer mailed to Maritza Santiago-Porter on 4/9/21. (Pacho, Arnold)
April 9, 2021 Filing 7 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to 06/02/2021 to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Nysha Sanchez. (Pacho, Arnold)
April 9, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to 06/02/2021 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Nysha Sanchez.(Zamorski, Michael)
April 7, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Natasha St. Onge. Nysha Sanchez served on 3/29/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. Acknowledgement filed by Natasha St. Onge. (Davis, Tara)
April 7, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Natasha St. Onge. Curry College served on 3/30/2021, answer due 4/20/2021. Acknowledgement filed by Natasha St. Onge. (Davis, Tara)
February 26, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Curry College, Nysha Sanchez. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley)
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
February 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nysha Sanchez, Curry College Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8654469 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Natasha St. Onge. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, (2) Category Sheet)(Davis, Tara) (Category Sheet added on 2/26/21, provided by counsel) (Currie, Haley).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Onge v. Curry College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curry College
Represented By: Kevin M. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nysha Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha St. Onge
Represented By: Tara Jill Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?