Thomas v. Barnstable County Correctional Facility
Plaintiff: Terrence Thomas
Defendant: Barnstable County Correctional Facility
Case Number: 1:2021cv10398
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Terrence Thomas.(McDonagh, Christina)
April 21, 2021 Filing 10 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. In light of Thomass letter #9 , the Court will refrain from adjudicating his motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis for the next 35 days. If, during that time, Thomas indicates to the Court that he no longer intends to prosecute this action at this time, the Court will consider the action to be voluntarily dismissed, deem the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis to be moot, and not assess a filing fee. If Thomas does not so inform the Court within 35 days, the Court will proceed to adjudicate the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. If the Court grants the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, Thomas will be required to pay the $350 filing fee over time regardless of the outcome of the case (including dismissal under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) or 1915A, or Thomas's subsequent voluntary dismissal of the action). See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). (PSSA, 3)
April 7, 2021 Filing 9 Letter/request (non-motion) from Terrence Thomas. (Castilla, Francis)
March 17, 2021 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Terrence Thomas. (McDonagh, Christina)
March 17, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Terrence Thomas.(McDonagh, Christina)
March 9, 2021 Filing 4 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. Procedural Order regarding resolution of filling fee. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff must respond within 21 days. (Castilla, Francis)
March 9, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
March 8, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Terrence Thomas.(Castilla, Francis)
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Terrence Thomas.(Castilla, Francis)
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Barnstable County Correctional Facility, filed by Terrence Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category form, #3 waiver, #4 summons)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Barnstable County Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnstable County Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?