Cato Corporation et al v. Cato (HK) Limited
Plaintiff: Cato of Texas L.P. and Cato Corporation
Defendant: Cato (HK) Limited
Case Number: 1:2021cv10404
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
Presiding Judge: Judith G Dein
Referring Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 5/3/2021 before Judge Patti B. Saris is CANCELED. (Baker, Casey)
April 22, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Weindruch, F.)
March 29, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Hearing.This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Scheduling Conference set for 5/3/2021 09:30 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Baker, Casey)
March 26, 2021 Filing 23 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot #10 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Baker, Casey)
March 25, 2021 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Reassignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
March 25, 2021 Filing 21 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Weindruch, F.)
March 16, 2021 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Since this case was transferred to the District of Massachusetts from the Western District of North Carolina, counsel is reminded that a notification form indicating whether or not the parties have consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge has not been filed. Submission of the form is mandatory and a completed form should be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
March 9, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Danieli, Chris)
March 9, 2021 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Western; Case Number 3:20-cv-00117.
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #13 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The Clerk is respectfully DIRECTED to transfer the case to the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts.. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 3/9/21. (clc)
September 8, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Cato (HK) Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit Kong)(Ladenheim, Matthew)
August 31, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Cato Corporation, Cato of Texas L.P.. Replies due by 9/8/2020 (Wilson, J.)
August 17, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Cato (HK) Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit Kong, #2 Exhibit HK Trademark, #3 Exhibit Notice from HK TM)(Ladenheim, Matthew)
August 17, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Cato (HK) Limited. Responses due by 8/31/2020 (Ladenheim, Matthew)
August 3, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Cato (HK) Limited, filed by Cato Corporation, Cato of Texas L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Wilson, J.)
July 20, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Cato (HK) Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Kong Declaration, #2 Exhibit Registration, #3 Exhibit Notice from HK TM)(Ladenheim, Matthew)
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Cato (HK) Limited. Responses due by 8/3/2020 (Ladenheim, Matthew)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant Cato (HK) Limited shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before July 20, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/30/17. (mga)
June 29, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Cato (HK) Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ladenheim, Matthew). Motions referred to David Keesler.
June 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Ladenheim on behalf of All Defendants (Ladenheim, Matthew)
June 10, 2020 Entry deleted. Entered in error.
May 28, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Cato Corporation, Cato of Texas L.P.. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Wilson, J.)
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Cato (HK) Limited. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ctb)
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT on the Filing of an action regarding patent and/or trademark numbers contained in complaint. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ctb)
February 26, 2020 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (ctb)
February 26, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ctb)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cato of Texas L.P. (Wilson, J.)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cato Corporation (Wilson, J.)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cato (HK) Limited with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4403208), filed by Cato Corporation, Cato of Texas L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Trademark Registration Certificates), #2 Exhibit 2 (Chart of Trademark Registrations), #3 Exhibit 3 (Printout of Defendant's Website))(Wilson, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cato Corporation et al v. Cato (HK) Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cato (HK) Limited
Represented By: Matthew J. Ladenheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cato of Texas L.P.
Represented By: J. Mark Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cato Corporation
Represented By: J. Mark Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?