IEP Technologies, LLC v. KPM Analytics, Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: IEP Technologies, LLC
Defendant: KPM Analytics North America Corporation, KPM Analytics, Incorporated, Statera Analytics, Incorporated and Process Sensors Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv10417
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed KPM Analytics North America Corporation served on 4/20/2021, answer due 5/11/2021. (Ball, Stephen)
April 22, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed KPM Analytics, Incorporated served on 4/20/2021, answer due 5/11/2021. (Ball, Stephen)
March 11, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to KPM Analytics North America Corporation, KPM Analytics, Incorporated. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
March 11, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by IEP Technologies, LLC identifying Corporate Parent HOERBIGER Service Inc. for IEP Technologies, LLC.. (Ball, Stephen)
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Ball, Stephen)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KPM Analytics North America Corporation, KPM Analytics, Incorporated Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8674387 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by IEP Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Category Form)(Ball, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IEP Technologies, LLC v. KPM Analytics, Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KPM Analytics North America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KPM Analytics, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Statera Analytics, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Process Sensors Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IEP Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Stephen F.W. Ball, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?