Alastin Skincare, Inc. v. LK Cosmetic NY LLC
Plaintiff: Alastin Skincare, Inc.
Defendant: LK Cosmetic NY LLC doing business as Amazon Reseller "Health&BeautyKing"
Case Number: 1:2021cv10425
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2021 Filing 13 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered ALLOWING #12 Motion for Default Judgment (Vieira, Leonardo)
April 16, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Default Judgment by Alastin Skincare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Counsel, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nickerson, Morgan)
April 16, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by Alastin Skincare, Inc. OF DISMISSAL OF COUNT II & COUNT III ONLY (Nickerson, Morgan)
April 7, 2021 Filing 10 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered: STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment re #9 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default (Vieira, Leonardo)
April 7, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to LK Cosmetic NY LLC (Vieira, Leonardo)
April 6, 2021 Filing 8 Request for notice of default by Alastin Skincare, Inc. . (Brodsky, Jack)
March 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack S. Brodsky on behalf of Alastin Skincare, Inc. (Brodsky, Jack)
March 22, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Alastin Skincare, Inc.. LK Cosmetic NY LLC served on 3/12/2021, answer due 4/2/2021. Acknowledgement filed by Alastin Skincare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Brodsky, Jack)
March 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan T. Nickerson on behalf of Alastin Skincare, Inc. (Nickerson, Morgan)
March 11, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to LK Cosmetic NY LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
March 11, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Brodsky, Jack)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LK Cosmetic NY LLC Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8676199 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Alastin Skincare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Brodsky, Jack)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alastin Skincare, Inc. v. LK Cosmetic NY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alastin Skincare, Inc.
Represented By: Jack S. Brodsky
Represented By: Morgan T. Nickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LK Cosmetic NY LLC doing business as Amazon Reseller "Health&BeautyKing"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?