Souza v. St. Anne's Credit Union
Plaintiff: Heather Souza
Defendant: St. Anne's Credit Union and Does 1-5
Case Number: 1:2021cv10472
Filed: March 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Heather Souza.(Craig, Christine)
April 20, 2021 Filing 11 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Added Sean Drake. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Baker, Casey)
April 20, 2021 Filing 10 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Added James R. Branit. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Baker, Casey)
April 19, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sean Darke Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8734640 by St. Anne's Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sean Darke)(Kavanagh, Eileen)
April 19, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of James Branit Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8734636 by St. Anne's Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James Branit)(Kavanagh, Eileen)
April 7, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Heather Souza. St. Anne's Credit Union served on 3/31/2021, answer due 4/21/2021. Acknowledgement filed by Heather Souza. (Craig, Christine)
April 2, 2021 Filing 6 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #5 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by St. Anne's Credit Union. "Adopted. When requesting any continuances in the future, please submit the request in the form of a motion."Response to #1 Complaint due 5/20/2021. (Baker, Casey)
April 2, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND by St. Anne's Credit Union. (Kavanagh, Eileen)
April 2, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Eileen P. Kavanagh on behalf of St. Anne's Credit Union (Kavanagh, Eileen)
March 18, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle)
March 18, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
March 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against St. Anne's Credit Union Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8687081 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Heather Souza. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Category Form)(Craig, Christine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Souza v. St. Anne's Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Souza
Represented By: Christine M. Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Anne's Credit Union
Represented By: James R. Branit
Represented By: Eileen P. Kavanagh
Represented By: Sean Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?