Harvard Immigration and Refugee Clinical Program v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Harvard Immigration and Refugee Clinical Program
Defendant: Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Department of Justice, Department of Homeland Security and U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Case Number: 1:2021cv10486
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Judith G Dein
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2021 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. ORDER of Temporary Admission. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
May 5, 2021 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED #9 Assented to MOTION For Leave To Appear As A Law Student Sujin Kim by Harvard Immigration and Refugee Clinical Program. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
April 30, 2021 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION For Leave To Appear As A Law Student Sujin Kim by Harvard Immigration and Refugee Clinical Program. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Law, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Sujin Kim, #3 Exhibit Certification Form)(Ahmed, Sameer)
April 28, 2021 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant's ANSWER due by 5/24/2021. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
April 27, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Harvard Immigration and Refugee Clinical Program.. (Ahmed, Sameer)
April 27, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Since this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, Defendant's counsel is reminded that a notification form indicating whether or not the parties have consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge has not been filed. Submission of the form is mandatory and a completed form should be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
April 26, 2021 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 5/24/21 to File Response/Reply by Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Customs and Border Protection.(Poswistilo, Susan)
April 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan M. Poswistilo on behalf of Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Customs and Border Protection (Poswistilo, Susan)
March 22, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
March 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Danieli, Chris)
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8691283 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Harvard Immigration and Refugee Clinical Program. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 JS45, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31)(Ahmed, Sameer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harvard Immigration and Refugee Clinical Program v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Susan M. Poswistilo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Office for Immigration Review
Represented By: Susan M. Poswistilo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Represented By: Susan M. Poswistilo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Susan M. Poswistilo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Susan M. Poswistilo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvard Immigration and Refugee Clinical Program
Represented By: Sameer Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?