Monette v. Stat Ambulance Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stephen Monette, Jr.
Defendant: Stat Ambulance Service, Inc. doing business as Stat/SouthCoast Emergency Management Systems
Case Number: 1:2021cv10505
Filed: March 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Donald L Cabell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to May 28, 2021 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Stat Ambulance Service, Inc..(McGurn, Kristin)
May 17, 2021 Filing 9 Withdrawal of motion: #6 Request for notice of default filed by Stephen Monette, Jr... (Bresley, Elijah)
May 17, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Russo, Noreen)
May 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin G. McGurn on behalf of Stat Ambulance Service, Inc. (McGurn, Kristin)
May 11, 2021 Filing 6 Request for notice of default by Stephen Monette, Jr . (Bresley, Elijah)
April 28, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Stat Ambulance Service, Inc. served on 4/9/2021, answer due 4/30/2021. (Bresley, Elijah)
April 27, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Elijah Bresley on behalf of Stephen Monette, Jr (Bresley, Elijah)
March 25, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Stat Ambulance Service, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle)
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Danieli, Chris)
March 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stat Ambulance Service, Inc. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8696439 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Stephen Monette. (Attachments: #1 Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Smith-Lee, Emily) (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/25/2021) (Kelly, Danielle).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monette v. Stat Ambulance Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Monette, Jr.
Represented By: Emily E. Smith-Lee
Represented By: Elijah Bresley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stat Ambulance Service, Inc. doing business as Stat/SouthCoast Emergency Management Systems
Represented By: Kristin G. McGurn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?