Winsor v. TBD Pizza et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Winsor
Defendant: TBD Pizza, John Doe 1-10, Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard and John Doe Corporation 1-10
Case Number: 1:2021cv10551
Filed: March 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2022 Filing 127 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING: Settlement Conference reset for 5/18/2022 04:00 PM in Courtroom 13 (In person only) before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. Note: change is to time only! (Belmont, Kellyann)
January 14, 2022 Filing 126 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #125 Motion to Continue. The settlement conference has been reset for 5/18/2022 02:30 PM in Courtroom 13 (In person only) before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Simeone, Maria)
January 13, 2022 Filing 125 Assented to MOTION to Continue April 29, 2022 Hearing by Joshua Winsor.(Jepsen, Meaghan)
December 23, 2021 Filing 124 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Settlement Conference set for 4/29/2022 02:00 PM in Courtroom 13 (In person only) before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Dore, Samantha)
December 23, 2021 Filing 123 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #121 MOTION for Preliminary Approval. ALLOWED. (Dore, Samantha)
December 23, 2021 Filing 122 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. (Dore, Samantha)
December 21, 2021 Filing 121 MOTION for Preliminary Approval by Joshua Winsor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement and Release, #2 Exhibit Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Approve Settlement, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Jepsen, Meaghan)
November 17, 2021 Filing 120 Reset Deadlines: Motion for preliminary approval due by 12/21/2021 (Simeone, Maria)
November 17, 2021 Filing 119 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #118 Motion to Stay Pending Settlement. Motion for preliminary approval due by 12/21/21. (Simeone, Maria)
November 12, 2021 Filing 118 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Settlement by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza.(Fritz, Jeffrey)
November 1, 2021 Filing 117 Set Deadlines: competing proposed consent forms/competing proposed schedules due by 11/12/2021 (Simeone, Maria)
October 29, 2021 Filing 116 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: re #115 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza. ALLOWED. Stay VACATED. Parties to file agreed or competing proposed consent forms by November 12, 2021 as well as joint or competing proposed schedules. (Dore, Samantha)
October 28, 2021 Filing 115 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza. (Fritz, Jeffrey)
October 5, 2021 Filing 114 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. The status conference set for 10/6/21 has been canceled in light of the mediation. (Simeone, Maria)
August 13, 2021 Filing 113 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #112 Joint Status Report. The parties shall file a further status report seven days after mediation. (Pacho, Arnold)
August 12, 2021 Filing 112 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza. (Fritz, Jeffrey)
July 30, 2021 Filing 111 Set Deadlines: Status Report regarding mediation due by 8/12/2021 (Simeone, Maria)
July 12, 2021 Filing 110 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #109 Joint MOTION to Stay. ALLOWED. This matter is STAYED pending the mediation. The parties shall report to the Court on the schedule for the mediation at the earlier of within seven days of arranging the date for the mediation or August 12, 2021 whichever is earlier. (Currie, Haley)
July 12, 2021 Filing 109 Joint MOTION to Stay by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza.(Fritz, Jeffrey)
July 9, 2021 Filing 108 Set Deadlines: Revised Notice/Proposed Amendments to Schedule or Motion to Stay due by 7/13/2021 (Simeone, Maria)
June 30, 2021 Filing 107 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #106 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to July 13, 2021 to File Revised Notice/Proposed Amendments to Schedule or Motion to Stay. ALLOWED. (Pacho, Arnold)
June 29, 2021 Filing 106 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to July 13, 2021 to File Revised Notice/Proposed Amendments to Schedule or Motion to Stay by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza.(Fritz, Jeffrey)
June 24, 2021 Filing 105 Reset Deadlines: Revised Notice and Proposed Adjustments to Scheduling Order due by 6/29/2021 (Simeone, Maria)
June 22, 2021 Filing 104 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #103 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to June 29, 2021 for One-Week Extension of Time to File Revised Notice and Proposed Adjustments to Scheduling Order. ALLOWED. (Pacho, Arnold)
June 21, 2021 Filing 103 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to June 29,2021 to One-Week Extension of Time to File Revised Notice and Proposed Adjustments to Scheduling Order by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza.(Fritz, Jeffrey)
June 8, 2021 Filing 102 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. Plaintiff's Motion to Send Notice (Doc. No. #24 ) is ALLOWED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Within fourteen days, the parties shall submit a revised Form Notice consistent with the Court's rulings. Any proposed adjustments to the schedule governing this case necessitated by this ruling must also be submitted within fourteen days. (Pacho, Arnold)
May 27, 2021 Filing 101 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #24 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Fritz, Jeffrey)
May 27, 2021 Filing 100 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #95 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Frank V. Raimond. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Pacho, Arnold)
May 27, 2021 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Meaghan A. Jepsen on behalf of Joshua Winsor (Jepsen, Meaghan)
May 9, 2021 Filing 98 Filing fee/payment: $ 100.00, receipt number 1BST084868 for #95 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Frank V. Raimond (McAlear, Jim)
April 26, 2021 Filing 97 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #24 Defendants' Supplemental Memorandum Re: Plaintiff's Motion for Notice (Doc. NO. 24) filed by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Cited Cases)(Fritz, Jeffrey)
April 26, 2021 Filing 96 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Support re #24 Motion to Send Notice to Similarly Situated Employees filed by Joshua Winsor. (Pacho, Arnold)
April 26, 2021 Filing 95 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Frank V. Raimond by Joshua Winsor. (Attachments: #1 Certification) (Pacho, Arnold)
April 13, 2021 Filing 94 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. A Status Conference is set for 10/6/2021 at 02:45 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Montes, Mariliz)
April 12, 2021 Filing 93 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motions due by 1/28/2022(Montes, Mariliz) (Main Document 93 replaced on 4/13/2021) (Montes, Mariliz). NEF regenerated on 4/13/2021 (Montes, Mariliz).
April 12, 2021 Filing 92 Set Deadlines: Per #89 Order: counsel for the Plaintiff to file either (or both) a motion to appear pro hac vice or an application for membership in the bar of this Court by 4/26/2021. (Montes, Mariliz)
April 12, 2021 Filing 91 Set Deadlines as to #24 MOTION to send notice to similarly situated employees: Simultaneous briefs due by 4/26/2021. (Montes, Mariliz)
April 12, 2021 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer A. Scully on behalf of Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza (Scully, Jennifer)
April 12, 2021 Filing 89 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered.The Court now ADOPTS Magistrate Judge Johnstone's Report and Recommendation, ALLOWS the Motion to Compel, and ORDERS that Plaintiff provide its discovery responses within fourteen days. The Recommendation from Magistrate Judge Johnstone was correct as to the law and wise in its application of Rule 26 to this case.The Court ADOPTS the schedule proposed by the Defendants (and largely unobjected to by the Plaintiff) as it appears on pages five and six of the Joint Status Report (Doc. No. 88). The Clerk shall schedule a status conference for the first week of October and issue this Session's Form Scheduling Order with the deadlines proposed by the parties. Within fourteen days after the Court's ruling on the Motion to Send Notice, the parties shall propose the adjustments, if any, to the governing schedule needed as a result of that decision. re #75 Order on Motion to Compel,, #24 Motion to Send Notice filed by Joshua Winsor (Montes, Mariliz)
April 8, 2021 Filing 88 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza. (Fritz, Jeffrey)
April 8, 2021 Filing 87 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Tara E. Lynch and Abigail Shaine (Lynch, Tara)
April 7, 2021 Filing 86 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Tara E. Lynch (Lynch, Tara)
April 2, 2021 Filing 85 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. ORDER REQUIRING COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL PRACTICES OF THIS SESSION.(Montes, Mariliz)
April 1, 2021 Filing 84 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Within seven days, the parties shall file a joint status report identifying (1) any pending motions requiring resolution; (2) the schedule the parties jointly or separately propose to govern the remainder of this lawsuit and (3) any other matter the parties wish to bring to the attention of the Court.( Status Report due by 4/8/2021)(Montes, Mariliz)
March 31, 2021 Filing 83 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris)
March 31, 2021 Filing 82 Case transferred in from District of New Hampshire; Case Number 1:19-cv-00992.
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, convenience, efficient use of judicial resources, respect for mandatory forum selection clauses, and the interests of justice, all favor transferring this matter to the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts. The court directs the clerk to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts, specifically to the sessions sitting in Boston. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lw)
March 30, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (lw)
March 25, 2021 Filing 80 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM Showing Cause Why the Court Should Not Transfer this Action to Massachusetts by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza(Fritz, Jeffrey)
March 24, 2021 Filing 79 OBJECTION to #78 MOTION to Extend Time to Discovery Deadlines until the Choice of Venue Issue is Resolved filed by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza. Follow up on Reply on 3/31/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Fritz, Jeffrey)
March 24, 2021 Filing 78 MOTION to Extend Time to Discovery Deadlines until the Choice of Venue Issue is Resolved filed by Joshua Winsor.Follow up on Objection on 4/7/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bedard, Biron)
March 19, 2021 Filing 77 NOTICE of Consent to Change Venue and Transfer of Case by Joshua Winsor.(Bedard, Biron)
March 19, 2021 Filing 76 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to File Memorandum Showing Cause Why the Court Should Not Transfer This Action to Massachusetts to March 26, 2021 filed by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza.(Fritz, Jeffrey)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #76 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to File Memorandum Showing Cause Why the Court Should Not Transfer This Action to Massachusetts. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Memoranda due 3/26/2021. (lw)
March 15, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing. Case Management Conference via Video set for 4/15/2021 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #38 Motion to Compel and For Modification of Scheduling Order. TBDs motion to compel (doc. no. 38) is granted. The motion to modify (doc. no. 38) the scheduling order is granted in part and denied in part, as specified above. Winsor is ordered to respond to all pending discovery requests regarding vehicle expenses by April 1, 2021. The clerk's office shall schedule a case management conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(lw)
March 12, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/12/2021. Counsel to let the deputy clerk know if the parties agree to a change in venue. If the parties do not agree, counsel shall file a memo, within one week, to show cause why it should not be transferred. (Pltfs Atty: Biron Bedard, Frank Raimond) (Defts Atty: Jeffrey Fritz, Abigail Shaine)(Total Hearing Time: 20 minutes) (lw)
March 9, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing. COUNSEL ONLY Status Conference set for 3/12/2021 02:00 PM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lw)
February 26, 2021 Filing 74 RESPONSE re #73 Notice (Other), filed by Joshua Winsor. (Bedard, Biron)
February 25, 2021 Filing 73 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dahlk Decision on MSJ, #2 Exhibit B - Dahlk Decision Denying Cross-Motion, #3 Exhibit C - Rake Decision Denying Cross-Motion)(Fritz, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/26/2021 to link to #38(lw).
February 25, 2021 Filing 72 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Menard Order Granting MTD)(Fritz, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/25/2021 to link to doc. no. 38(lw).
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #71 Assented to Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel. Text of Order: Granted. Within 48 hours counsel shall electronically refile the pleading attached to the Motion for Leave to File using the appropriate event in CMECF. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 3/1/2021.(lw)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #69 Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel. Text of Order: Granted. Within 48 hours counsel shall electronically refile the pleading attached to the Motion for Leave to File using the appropriate event in CMECF. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 2/26/2021.(lw)
February 24, 2021 Filing 71 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel filed by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Supplemental Authority)(Fritz, Jeffrey)
February 23, 2021 Filing 70 RESPONSE to Motion re #69 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel filed by Joshua Winsor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mooney Arbitration Decision, #2 Exhibit Flynn Arbitration Decision)(Bedard, Biron)
February 22, 2021 Filing 69 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel filed by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza.Follow up on Objection on 3/8/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Supplemental Authority)(Fritz, Jeffrey)
February 18, 2021 Filing 68 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Joshua Winsor. Attorney Meaghan A. Jepsen added to party Joshua Winsor(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2.11.21 Arbitration Decision)(Jepsen, Meaghan) Modified on 2/18/2021 link to doc. no. 38(lw).
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #66 Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Motion to Compel. Text of Order: Granted. Within 48 hours counsel shall electronically refile the pleading attached to the Motion for Leave to File using the appropriate event in CMECF. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 2/19/2021.(lw)
February 14, 2021 Filing 67 RESPONSE to Motion re #66 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Motion to Compel filed by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Menard Decision)(Fritz, Jeffrey)
February 12, 2021 Filing 66 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Motion to Compel filed by Joshua Winsor.Follow up on Objection on 2/26/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Supplemental Authority, #2 Exhibit Order from Sam Hanson)(Bedard, Biron)
February 10, 2021 Filing 65 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Abigail Anne Shaine on behalf of Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza Attorney Abigail Anne Shaine added to party Eric DeLorenzo(pty:dft), Attorney Abigail Anne Shaine added to party Robert P. Rivard(pty:dft), Attorney Abigail Anne Shaine added to party TBD Pizza(pty:dft).(Shaine, Abigail)
January 15, 2021 Filing 64 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Edwards_Slip Copy (2020))(Fritz, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/19/2021 to link to doc. no. 38 (lw).
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #62 Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel. Text of Order: Granted. Within 48 hours counsel shall electronically refile the pleading attached to the Motion for Leave to File using the appropriate event in CMECF. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 1/19/2021.(lw)
January 7, 2021 Filing 63 OBJECTION to #62 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel filed by Joshua Winsor. Follow up on Reply on 1/14/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Bedard, Biron)
January 5, 2021 Filing 62 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel filed by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza.Follow up on Objection on 1/19/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Supplemental Authority)(Fritz, Jeffrey)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #60 MOTION to Continue December 14, 2020 hearing. Text of Order: The hearing scheduled for December 14, 2020 is cancelled and the motion to continue (doc. no. 60) is denied as moot. The motion to compel (doc. no. 38) will be decided based on the parties' submissions. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad)
December 9, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. MOTION HEARING held on 12/9/2020 re #60 MOTION to Continue December 14, 2020 hearing . Order to issue. (Court Reporter: Susan Bateman) (Pltfs Atty: Biron Bedard, Frank Raimond) (Defts Atty: Tara Lynch, Jeffrey Fritz)(Total Hearing Time: 12 min.) (kad)
December 9, 2020 NOTICE re: #60 MOTION to Continue December 14, 2020 hearing. Motion Hearing via Telephone Conference set for 12/9/2020 04:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The court will contact counsel with the call-in information. (kad)
December 8, 2020 Filing 61 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #60 MOTION to Continue December 14, 2020 hearing filed by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza. Follow up on Reply on 12/15/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Fritz, Jeffrey)
December 8, 2020 Filing 60 MOTION to Continue December 14, 2020 hearing filed by Joshua Winsor.Follow up on Objection on 12/22/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law Memo in Support of Motion to Continue Hearing, #2 Exhibit AAA Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Bedard, Biron)
December 2, 2020 NOTICE re: #38 MOTION to Compel and For Modification of Scheduling Order. MOTION HEARING via Video set for 12/14/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad)
October 27, 2020 Filing 59 SURREPLY to Reply to #38 MOTION to Compel and For Modification of Scheduling Order filed by Joshua Winsor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Entry Order re Hatmaker v. PJ Ohio)(Bedard, Biron)
October 22, 2020 Filing 58 REPLY to Objection to Motion re #38 MOTION to Compel and For Modification of Scheduling Order filed by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza. Surreply due by 10/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Fritz, Jeffrey)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #56 Assented to Motion for Leave to File Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel. Text of Order: Granted. Within 48 hours counsel shall electronically refile the pleading attached to the Motion for Leave to File using the appropriate event in CMECF. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 10/26/2020.(lw)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #54 Joint Assented to Motion to Extend Time for Modification of Scheduling Order. Text of Order: Granted to the extent that the parties seek a stay of the deadlines currently in the scheduling order. The clerk's office shall schedule a case management conference upon resolution of the pending motion to compel. The court declines to set new deadlines at this time. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(lw)
October 22, 2020 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #58 Reply to Objection to Motion, filed by TBD Pizza, Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard. No description of exhibits or attachments was included. Exhibits or attachments shall be followed by a short description of the document and shall not exceed five words. AP 2.5(a). See #Properly Attach Exhibits to Pleadings in ECF. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(lw)
October 21, 2020 Filing 57 RESPONSE , Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Opposition to Their September 9, 2020 Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza. (Fritz, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/22/2020 to link to doc. no. 24 (lw).
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #55 Assented to Motion for Leave to File Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Opposition to Their September 9, 2020 Notice of Supplemental Authority. Text of Order: Granted. Within 48 hours counsel shall electronically refile the pleading attached to the Motion for Leave to File using the appropriate event in CMECF. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 10/23/2020.(lw)
October 20, 2020 Filing 56 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel filed by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - DEF Reply ISO Their Mot to Compel)(Fritz, Jeffrey)
October 20, 2020 Filing 55 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Opposition to Their September 9, 2020 Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - DEF Resp to PL Opp to 9.9.20 Supp Authority)(Fritz, Jeffrey)
October 20, 2020 Filing 54 Joint Assented to MOTION to Extend Time for Modification of Scheduling Order filed by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment to Jt. Motion for Modification)(Fritz, Jeffrey)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #53 Joint Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Reply and Modification of Scheduling Order. Text of Order: LR 7.1(a)(1) states, in relevant part, that [f]ilers shall not combine multiple motions seeking separate and distinct relief into a single filing. Separate motions must be filed. Objections to pending motions and affirmative motions for relief shall not be combined in one filing. Doc. no. 53 seeks multiple forms of relief and therefore does not comply with LR 7.1(a)(1). Accordingly, the motion is denied without prejudice to refiling in compliance with the local rule. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(lw)
October 9, 2020 Filing 53 Joint Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Reply and Modification of Scheduling Order filed by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Fritz, Jeffrey)
October 9, 2020 Filing 52 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM re #51 Notice (Other), Opposing Defendants' Second Notice of Supplemental Authority by Joshua Winsor(Bedard, Biron) Modified on 10/22/2020 to link to doc. no. 24 (lw).
October 6, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Second Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Send Notice to Similarly-Situated Employees by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Blose et al. v. Jarinc LTD dba Dominos Pizza (Decision 9.14.20))(Fritz, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/13/2020 to link to doc. no. 28 (lw). Modified on 10/22/2020 to link to doc. no. 24 (lw).
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #46 Motion for Leave to File Defendants' Second Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Send Notice to Similarly-Situated Employees. Text of Order: Granted. Within 48 hours counsel shall electronically refile the pleading attached to the Motion for Leave to File using the appropriate event in CMECF. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 10/8/2020.(lw)
October 2, 2020 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Defendants' Second Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Send Notice to Similarly-Situated Employees filed by Joshua Winsor. Follow up on Reply on 10/9/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Bedard, Biron) Modified on 10/22/2020 to link to doc. no. 24 (lw).
October 2, 2020 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #38 MOTION to Compel and For Modification of Scheduling Order filed by Joshua Winsor. Follow up on Reply on 10/9/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Bedard, Biron)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #45 Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond to #43 Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Send Notice to Similarly-Situated Employees. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lw)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #44 Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond re #38 Motion to Compel. Text of Order: Granted. However, there shall be no further extensions of time for plaintiff to object/respond to the pending motion to compel and for modification (38) absent cause/unforeseeable exigency. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Objection on 10/2/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(lw)
September 18, 2020 Filing 48 OBJECTION to #45 MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to #43 Notice (Other), to October 2, 2020 filed by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza. Follow up on Reply on 9/25/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Fritz, Jeffrey)
September 18, 2020 Filing 47 OBJECTION to #44 MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to #38 MOTION to Compel and For Modification of Scheduling Order to October 2, 2020 filed by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza. Follow up on Reply on 9/25/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - FLSA 2020-12)(Fritz, Jeffrey)
September 15, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Second Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Send Notice to Similarly-Situated Employees filed by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza.Follow up on Objection on 9/29/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2nd Notice of Supplemental Authority)(Fritz, Jeffrey)
September 15, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to #43 Notice (Other), to October 2, 2020 filed by Joshua Winsor.Follow up on Objection on 9/29/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bedard, Biron)
September 15, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to #38 MOTION to Compel and For Modification of Scheduling Order to October 2, 2020 filed by Joshua Winsor.Follow up on Objection on 9/29/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bedard, Biron)
September 9, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Send Notice to Similarly-Situated Employees by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - USDOL FLSA2020-12, #2 Exhibit B - Kennedy_Mountainside)(Fritz, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/9/2020 to link to doc. no. 28(lw).
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #42 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond re #38 Motion to Compel. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Objection on 9/18/2020. (lw)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #41 Partially Assented to Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Send Notice to Similarly-Situated Employees. Text of Order: Granted. Within 48 hours counsel shall electronically refile the pleading attached to the Motion for Leave to File using the appropriate event in CMECF. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 9/10/2020.(lw)
September 3, 2020 Filing 42 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to #38 MOTION to Compel and For Modification of Scheduling Order to 09/18/2020 , filed by Joshua Winsor.(Bedard, Biron) Modified on 9/8/2020 to terminate duplicative event selection (lw).
September 3, 2020 Filing 41 Partially Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Send Notice to Similarly-Situated Employees filed by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza.Follow up on Objection on 9/17/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Supplemental Authority)(Fritz, Jeffrey)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #40 Partially Assented to Motion to Extend Time to for Opposition to Motion to Compel and Discovery Deadlines. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Objection on 9/3/2020. (lw)
August 20, 2020 Filing 40 Partially Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to for Opposition to Motion to Compel and Discovery Deadlines filed by Joshua Winsor.Follow up on Objection on 9/3/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment to Partially Assented to Motion)(Bedard, Biron)
August 10, 2020 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #39 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by TBD Pizza, Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard. Document should have been filed as an attachment to the main document (AP 2.5(a)). NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(lw)
August 7, 2020 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM in Support re #38 MOTION to Compel and For Modification of Scheduling Order filed by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza. (Fritz, Jeffrey)
August 7, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION to Compel and For Modification of Scheduling Order filed by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza.Follow up on Objection on 8/21/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Fritz, Jeffrey)
July 7, 2020 RESCHEDULED TRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Statements due 5/21/2021. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 6/4/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/9/2021 04:30 PM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 6/22/2021 09:30 AM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (lw)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #36 Joint Assented to Motion to Extend Time for Modification of Scheduling Order. Text of Order: Granted with the following modification: Trial is scheduled for the two week period beginning June 22, 2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Discovery deadline 1/19/2021. Summary Judgment Motions due by 2/16/2021.(lw)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PROTECTIVE ORDER. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(ko)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #35 Joint Assented to Motion for Protective Order. Text of Order: Granted; the proposed order is adopted as an order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(ko)
June 25, 2020 Filing 36 Joint Assented to MOTION to Extend Time for Modification of Scheduling Order filed by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza.(Fritz, Jeffrey)
June 25, 2020 Filing 35 Joint Assented to MOTION for Protective Order for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order filed by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Protective Order)(Fritz, Jeffrey)
June 5, 2020 Filing 34 SURREPLY to Reply to #24 MOTION to send notice to similarly situated employees filed by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza. (Fritz, Jeffrey)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #33 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to June 5, 2020 to Extend Deadline for Sur-Reply to Motion for Notice. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Surreply due by 6/5/2020.(lw)
June 1, 2020 Filing 33 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to June 5, 2020 to Extend Deadline for Sur-Reply to Motion for Notice filed by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza.(Fritz, Jeffrey)
May 26, 2020 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM in Support re #24 MOTION to send notice to similarly situated employees filed by Joshua Winsor. (Bedard, Biron)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #30 Assented to Motion to Continue and Extend Deadlines for Reply in Support of Motion for Notice. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Reply on 5/26/2020. (lw)
May 23, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #31 Assented to Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Send Notice to Similarly Situated Employees. Text of Order: Granted. Within 48 hours counsel shall electronically refile the pleading attached to the Motion for Leave to File using the appropriate event in CMECF. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 5/28/2020.(lw)
May 22, 2020 Filing 31 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Send Notice to Similarly Situated Employees filed by Joshua Winsor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply Memorandum)(Bedard, Biron)
May 21, 2020 Filing 30 Assented to MOTION to Continue and Extend Deadlines for Reply in Support of Motion for Notice filed by Joshua Winsor.(Bedard, Biron)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #29 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to file motion for leave to file reply. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Reply on 5/22/2020. (lw)
May 7, 2020 Filing 29 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to File Reply in Support of Motion for Notice filed by Joshua Winsor.(Bedard, Biron) Modified on 5/20/2020 to link to doc. no. 28 (lw).
May 1, 2020 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #24 MOTION to send notice to similarly situated employees filed by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza. Follow up on Reply on 5/8/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Rivard Declaration)(Fritz, Jeffrey)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #27 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to May 1, 2020 to Extend Deadline for Opposition to Motion for Notice. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Objection on 5/1/2020. (lw)
April 29, 2020 Filing 27 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to May 1, 2020 to Extend Deadline for Opposition to Motion for Notice filed by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza.(Fritz, Jeffrey)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #26 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to April 29, 2020 to Extend Deadline for Opposition to Motion for Notice. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Objection on 4/29/2020. (lw)
April 3, 2020 Filing 26 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to April 29, 2020 to Extend Deadline for Opposition to Motion for Notice filed by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza.(Fritz, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/6/2020 to link to doc. no. 24 (lw).
March 31, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew P. Kimble on behalf of Joshua Winsor (Kimble, Andrew)
March 25, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to send notice to similarly situated employees filed by Joshua Winsor.Follow up on Objection on 4/8/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law Memorandum in Support of Motion to Send Notice to Similarly Situated Employees, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Joshua Winsor, #3 Exhibit Notice of Opportunity to Join Unpaid Wage Lawsuit and Consent Form, #4 Exhibit Email to Putative Class Members)(Bedard, Biron)
March 24, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Frank Raimond on behalf of Joshua Winsor Attorney Frank Raimond added to party Joshua Winsor(pty:pla).(Raimond, Frank) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/24/2020: #1 Completed Appearance) (lw).
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #22 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to 04/17/2020 for Joinder of Additional Parties. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(lw)
March 19, 2020 Filing 22 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to 04/17/2020 for Joinder of Additional Parties filed by Joshua Winsor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Court's Scheduling Order)(Bedard, Biron)
January 10, 2020 TRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Statements due 3/19/2021. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 4/2/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2021 02:00 PM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 4/21/2021 09:30 AM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (lw)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER approving #20 Discovery Plan. Case Track: Complex. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. Text of Order: Approved and adopted as a pretrial scheduling order. Trial: 4/20/2021. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 4/17/2020. Discovery deadline 11/20/2020. Summary Judgment Motions due by 12/18/2020. (lw)
January 8, 2020 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error NO ACTION REQUIRED re: #21 Consent to Magistrate Judge Disposition on Motion, filed by Joshua Winsor. Filer used the wrong event. Filer should have used "Other Documents - Consent/Objection to Magistrate Judge Assignment". NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(kad)
January 8, 2020 Case reassigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Reason for Reassignment: Not all parties consent to the assignment of this case to the magistrate judge. The new case designation is: 19-cv-992-SM. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings.(kad)
January 7, 2020 Filing 21 OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT by Joshua Winsor re #20 Proposed Discovery Plan J filed by Joshua Winsor. In cases assigned to the Magistrate Judge, plaintiff, or the removing defendant if the case was initiated by a Notice of Removal, is responsible for filing a consent form on or.(Bedard, Biron) Modified on 1/8/2020 to CORRECT TEXT TO READ: "OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT" (kad).
January 7, 2020 Filing 20 Proposed Discovery Plan J filed by Joshua Winsor. In cases assigned to the Magistrate Judge, plaintiff, or the removing defendant if the case was initiated by a Notice of Removal, is responsible for filing a consent form on or before the deadline for filing the Discovery Plan using the Other Documents/Magistrate Judge Assignment--Consent/Objection event.(Bedard, Biron)
December 17, 2019 Filing 19 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Class and Collective Action Complaint filed by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza.(Fritz, Jeffrey)
December 17, 2019 Filing 18 Disclosure Statement by Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Fritz, Jeffrey)
December 17, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Fritz on behalf of Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza Attorney Jeffrey Fritz added to party Eric DeLorenzo(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Fritz added to party Robert P. Rivard(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Fritz added to party TBD Pizza(pty:dft).(Fritz, Jeffrey)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 Assented to MOTION for Jeffrey A. Fritz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Defendants TBD Pizza and Robert P. Rivard. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerk's office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(kad)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to December 17, 2019 by Defendants TBD Pizza and Robert P. Rivard. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 12/17/2019. (kad)
December 3, 2019 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error - NO ACTION REQUIRED - re: #13 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to December 17, 2019 by Defendants TBD Pizza and Robert P. Rivard filed by TBD Pizza - Consistent with Supplemental Rules of Electronic Case Filing, affidavits prepared in the context of the litigation shall be filed in electronically converted PDF format and shall contain a /s/ signature for both the signator and the notary/jurat. #15 Assented to MOTION for Jeffrey A. Fritz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Defendants TBD Pizza and Robert P. Rivard filed by TBD Pizza. Documents must be provided in an electronically converted PDF text searchable format in accordance with A.P. 2.3(a). Consistent with Supplemental Rules of Electronic Case Filing, affidavits prepared in the context of the litigation shall be filed in electronically converted PDF format and shall contain a /s/ signature for both the signator and the notary/jurat. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(kad)
December 3, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 1/14/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 1/7/2020. If no consent form has been filed, a consent form is due on or before the deadline for filing the discovery plan.(kad)
December 2, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Eric DeLorenzo by Joshua Winsor. Served/Mailed on 10/8/2019. Answer Follow Up on 12/10/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bedard, Biron)
December 2, 2019 Filing 15 Assented to MOTION for Jeffrey A. Fritz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Defendants TBD Pizza and Robert P. Rivard (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1900066.) filed by TBD Pizza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Jeffrey Fritz' Verified Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Defendants, TBD Pizza, Robert Rivard and Eric DeLorenzo)(Lynch, Tara)
December 2, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric DeLorenzo. Attorney Tara E. Lynch added to party Eric DeLorenzo(pty:dft).(Lynch, Tara)
December 2, 2019 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to December 17, 2019 by Defendants TBD Pizza and Robert P. Rivard filed by TBD Pizza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Tara E. Lynch)(Lynch, Tara)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Assented to MOTION for Philip J. Krzeski to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerk's office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(kad)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Assented to MOTION for Andrew P. Kimble to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerk's office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(kad)
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION for Philip J. Krzeski to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1898257.) filed by Joshua Winsor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Attachment to Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Bedard, Biron)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for Andrew P. Kimble to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1898251.) filed by Joshua Winsor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Attachment to Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Bedard, Biron)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Frank V. Raimond to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(kad)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 Addendum/ to #9 MOTION for Frank V. Raimond to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1891841.) by Joshua Winsor. (Bedard, Biron)
November 15, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED - NOTICE Nonconforming Document re: #9 MOTION for Frank V. Raimond to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Joshua Winsor. The document fails to comply with LR 7.1 - No statement of concurrence was included. File statement as addendum using the Other Documents/Addendum event and link filing(s) to document no. 9. The document will remain on file. Please note that unless a document curing the defect is filed by the Notice of Compliance Deadline the matter may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.Compliance Deadline set for 11/25/2019.(kad)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Frank V. Raimond to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1891841.) filed by Joshua Winsor.Follow up on Objection on 11/29/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) In Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit to Affidavit)(Bedard, Biron)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER. Text of Order: As not all parties have been served in the case, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). The court will schedule the pretrial conference once all defendants have been served or upon the expiration of time allowed for service on remaining defendants under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Attorneys Andrew P. Kimble, Esq., Phillip J. Krzeski, Esq. and Frank V. Raimond Esq. are not permitted to appear or practice before this court in this action until such time as motions for admission pro hac vice are filed and the required fee is paid, and they are not entitled to receive court notices and orders or pleadings filed by the parties in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer Complaint. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 12/3/2019. (kad)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer Complaint filed by Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza.(Lynch, Tara)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tara E. Lynch on behalf of Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza Attorney Tara E. Lynch added to party Robert P. Rivard(pty:dft), Attorney Tara E. Lynch added to party TBD Pizza(pty:dft).(Lynch, Tara)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed as to Robert P. Rivard by Joshua Winsor. Served/Mailed on 10/8/2019. Answer Follow Up on 10/29/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bedard, Biron)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed as to TBD Pizza by Joshua Winsor. Served/Mailed on 10/8/2019. Answer Follow Up on 10/29/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bedard, Biron)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summonses issued electronically as to Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate) (bt)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REGARDING VISITING ATTORNEY: The Local Rules for the District of New Hampshire provide that an attorney may, at the discretion of the court, on motion by a member of our bar, be permitted to practice before this court in a particular action. Any attorney so admitted shall at all times be associated with a member of the bar of this court. Our records indicate that no motions for pro hac vice admission of Andrew P. Kimble, Esq., Phillip J. Krzeski, Esq., Frank V. Raimond, Esq. have been received. Unless said motions with the required fee are filed within thirty (30) days, the case may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court.Compliance Deadline set for 10/24/2019. (bt)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff for service on all parties. (bt)
September 23, 2019 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-992-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
September 23, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1866991 filed by Joshua Winsor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet , #2 Summons - Waiver , #3 Summons - Waiver , #4 Summons - Waiver )(Bedard, Biron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winsor v. TBD Pizza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Winsor
Represented By: Frank V. Raimond
Represented By: Frank Raimond
Represented By: Biron L. Bedard
Represented By: Meaghan A. Jepsen
Represented By: Andrew P. Kimble
Represented By: Phillip J. Krzeski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBD Pizza
Represented By: Tara E. Lynch
Represented By: Abigail Anne Shaine
Represented By: Jeffrey Fritz
Represented By: Jennifer A. Scully
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric DeLorenzo
Represented By: Tara E. Lynch
Represented By: Abigail Anne Shaine
Represented By: Jeffrey Fritz
Represented By: Jennifer A. Scully
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert P. Rivard
Represented By: Tara E. Lynch
Represented By: Abigail Anne Shaine
Represented By: Jeffrey Fritz
Represented By: Jennifer A. Scully
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporation 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?