Clear Blue Insurance Company v Leung
Plaintiff: Clear Blue Insurance Company
Defendant: Kent Leung
Case Number: 1:2021cv10564
Filed: April 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. A Scheduling conference has been set for 6/15/2021 03:15 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Scheduling Conference set for 6/15/2021 03:15 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Attachments: #1 scheduling order sample, #2 standing order on summary judgment)(Simeone, Maria)
May 25, 2021 Filing 13 Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim made by Defendant by Clear Blue Insurance Company.(Kennedy-Smith, Samuel)
May 20, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. A Scheduling Conference has been set for 6/9/2021 03:15 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Attachments: #1 scheduling order sample, #2 standing order on summary judgment)This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Scheduling Conference set for 6/9/2021 03:15 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Simeone, Maria)
May 20, 2021 Filing 11 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. ORDER REQUIRING COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL PRACTICES OF THIS SESSION entered. (Simeone, Maria)
May 14, 2021 Filing 10 Defendant/Plaintiff in Counterclaim Kent Leung's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , First COUNTERCLAIM against Clear Blue Insurance Company by Kent Leung.(Labbe, Brendan)
May 7, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Service of and Response to Complaint by Kent Leung. (Labbe, Brendan)
April 26, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Service of and Response to Complaint by Kent Leung. (Labbe, Brendan)
April 26, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan L. Labbe on behalf of Kent Leung (Labbe, Brendan)
April 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Antonellis on behalf of Kent Leung (Antonellis, Anthony)
April 5, 2021 Filing 5 Summons returned executed filed by Clear Blue Insurance Company. Individual(s)/Entities served: Kent Leung., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clear Blue Insurance Company. Kent Leung served on 4/5/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. (Kennedy-Smith, Samuel) Modified on 4/7/2021 to correct description of filing (Montes, Mariliz).
April 2, 2021 Filing 4 Set Deadlines: Service to be completed by 7/1/2021. (Montes, Mariliz)
April 2, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
April 2, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
April 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory against Kent Leung Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8710453 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Clear Blue Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 JS45, #3 Exhibit A)(Kennedy-Smith, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clear Blue Insurance Company v Leung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Leung
Represented By: Brendan L. Labbe
Represented By: Anthony J. Antonellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clear Blue Insurance Company
Represented By: Samuel A. Kennedy-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?