Beier v. Massachusetts Supreme Judicial Court et al
Plaintiff: William J Beier
Defendant: Massachusetts Supreme Judicial Court, Commonwealth of Masachusetts and Salem Superior Court
Respondent: Superintendent Aaron Eastman
Case Number: 1:2021cv10565
Filed: April 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Judith G Dein
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered 1.The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. 2.The motion to appoint counsel is denied without prejudice.3.The Clerk shall return the civil complaint to petitioner Beier.4.The Court directs the Clerk to add Superintendent Aaron Eastman as a respondent.5.The Clerk shall serve a copy of the habeas petition upon the Respondents and the Attorney General for the Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Attention: Chief of the Appellate Division, Office of the Attorney General, One Ashburton Place, 18th Floor, Boston, MA 02108-1598. 6.Respondents shall, within twenty-one days of the date of this order, file a response to the petition.7.The Clerk shall provide the Respondents and the Attorney General for the Commonwealth with the form for Consent/Refusal of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction and the instructions for that form. (PSSA, 4)
April 5, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
April 2, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William J Beier. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Castilla, Francis) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/7/2021: #2 Supplement) (Castilla, Francis). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/17/2021: #3 Financial Affidavit) (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde).
April 2, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by William J Beier.(Castilla, Francis)
April 2, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) , filed by William J Beier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Category, # 2 Exhibit)(Castilla, Francis) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/7/2021) (Castilla, Francis). (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/17/2021 in accordance with documents filed - 2241- Petition.) (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde). (Additional attachment added on 5/17/2021: #3 Exhibits in support 2241 Petition, #4 Exhibits in support 2241 Petition) (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde). (Additional attachment added on 5/17/2021: #5 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by William J Beier, #6 Complaint - Exh 1, #7 Complaint - Exh 2, #8 Exhibit-Inmate Request) (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beier v. Massachusetts Supreme Judicial Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Supreme Judicial Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Masachusetts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salem Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J Beier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Superintendent Aaron Eastman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?