AMAG PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. v. AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: AMAG PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Defendant: AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2021cv10618
Filed: April 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Filing 13 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #12 Joint Stipulation Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint. Allowed. Answer due June 18, 2021. AMAG shall file its opposition to any Rule 12 motion filed by AGLI no later than 45 days after AGLI files such Rule 12 motion. (Pacho, Arnold)
June 10, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to the Complaint by AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Byers, Matthew)
June 9, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY served on 4/23/2021, answer due 5/14/2021. (Rosenthal, Marc)
June 3, 2021 Filing 10 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. ORDER REQUIRING COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL PRACTICES OF THIS SESSION entered. (Simeone, Maria)
June 2, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew B. Byers on behalf of AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY (Byers, Matthew)
June 2, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan D. Mutch on behalf of AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY (Mutch, Jonathan)
April 14, 2021 Filing 7 Set Deadlines: Service to be completed by 7/13/21. (Pacho, Arnold)
April 14, 2021 Filing 6 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Marc E. Rosenthal. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Pacho, Arnold)
April 13, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
April 13, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
April 13, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Marc E. Rosenthal Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8725784 by AMAG PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marc E. Rosenthal In Support)(Anderson, James)
April 13, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AMAG PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Covis Group S. r.l., Other Affiliate Apollo Management, L.P. for AMAG PHARMACEUTICALS, INC... (Anderson, James)
April 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8725730 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by AMAG PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet)(Anderson, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMAG PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. v. AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMAG PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: James R. Anderson
Represented By: Marc E. Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Matthew B. Byers
Represented By: Jonathan D. Mutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?