North American Specialty Insurance Company v. Laurence Clancy Construction Inc. et al
Plaintiff: North American Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Laurence Clancy Construction Inc. and JM Hardwood Floors Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv10623
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2021 Filing 10 Judge Denise J. Casper: Standing Order Regarding Appearance of Counsel Via Telephone or Videoconference(Hourihan, Lisa)
June 10, 2021 Filing 9 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. Standing Order Re: Courtroom Opportunities for Relatively Inexperienced Attorneys(Hourihan, Lisa)
June 10, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Scheduling ConferenceThis hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Scheduling Conference set for 7/12/2021 02:45 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
June 10, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against JM Hardwood Floors Corporation by Laurence Clancy Construction Inc..(Swartz, Jeffery)
May 24, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by JM Hardwood Floors Corporation.(Knight, John)
May 2, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed JM Hardwood Floors Corporation served on 4/21/2021, answer due 5/12/2021. (Loftus, Patrick)
May 2, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Laurence Clancy Construction Inc. served on 4/16/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. (Loftus, Patrick) (Main Document 4 replaced on 5/25/2021 with corrected document reflecting the defendant served) (Currie, Haley).
April 14, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JM Hardwood Floors Corporation, Laurence Clancy Construction Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JM Hardwood Floors, Laurence Clancy Construction Inc. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8728018 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by North American Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Category Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Loftus, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North American Specialty Insurance Company v. Laurence Clancy Construction Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurence Clancy Construction Inc.
Represented By: Jeffery Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JM Hardwood Floors Corporation
Represented By: John P. Knight, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North American Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick J. Loftus, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?