Sevelitte v. The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Renee Sevelitte
Defendant: The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Counter Defendant: Robyn A. Caplis-Sevelitte, Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph F. Sevelitte
Case Number: 1:2021cv10630
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Garick, Joshua)
June 3, 2021 Filing 17 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Initial Disclosures 7/25/21. Amended Pleadings due by 10/31/2021. Fact Discovery 2/15/2022. Trial experts by 3/15/22. Rebuttal by 4/15/22. All Experts by 5/15/22. Dispositive Motions 6/15/2022. ( Status Conference set for 2/23/2022 02:30 PM before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin.)(Simeone, Maria)
June 3, 2021 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling 6/9/21 Scheduling Conference. (Simeone, Maria)
June 3, 2021 Filing 15 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The Court ADOPTS the schedule proposed by the parties and, at the request of the parties, CANCELS the Rule 16 conference. The Court will hold a status conference on February 23, 2022 02:30 PM before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. re #13 Joint statement of counsel, ( Status Conference set for 2/23/2022 02:30 PM before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin.)(Simeone, Maria)
June 1, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (d)(3). (Collins, J.)
June 1, 2021 Filing 13 JOINT STATEMENT of counsel . (Collins, J.)
May 20, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. A Scheduling Conference has been set for 6/9/2021 03:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Attachments: #1 scheduling order sample, #2 standing order on summary judgment) This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violations of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or denial of entry to future hearings, and such other sanctions, including for contempt of court, as may be deemed appropriate or necessary by the court.Scheduling Conference set for 6/9/2021 03:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Simeone, Maria)
May 13, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Guardian's Counterclaim by Renee Sevelitte. (Pacho, Arnold)
May 7, 2021 Filing 10 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. ORDER REQUIRING COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL PRACTICES OF THIS SESSION entered. (Simeone, Maria)
May 3, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robyn A. Caplis-Sevelitte, Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph F. Sevelitte. Robyn A. Caplis-Sevelitte, Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph F. Sevelitte waiver sent on 4/26/2021, answer due 6/25/2021. (Garick, Joshua)
May 3, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua N. Garick on behalf of Robyn A. Caplis-Sevelitte, Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph F. Sevelitte (Garick, Joshua)
April 28, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Robyn A. Caplis-Sevelitte, Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph F. Sevelitte. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Simeone, Maria)
April 27, 2021 Filing 6 STATE COURT Record Renee Sevelitte summons served on 4/7/2021, answer due 4/28/2021.. (Collins, J.)
April 26, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and, COUNTERCLAIM for Interpleader against Robyn A. Caplis-Sevelitte, Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph F. Sevelitte by The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. (Collins, J.)
April 15, 2021 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Kelly, Danielle)
April 15, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
April 15, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. (Collins, J.)
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8730407 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons with Acceptance, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Docket, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Category Sheet)(Collins, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sevelitte v. The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Sevelitte
Represented By: William Kevin Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: J. Christopher Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Robyn A. Caplis-Sevelitte, Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph F. Sevelitte
Represented By: Joshua N. Garick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?