Brilliant Home Technology, Inc. v. Amazon Seller "eMonkey"
Plaintiff: Brilliant Home Technology, Inc.
Defendant: Amazon Seller "eMonkey"
Case Number: 1:2021cv10650
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brilliant Home Technology, Inc. (Gianetta, Emily)
June 3, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Amazon Seller "eMonkey" by Brilliant Home Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Nickerson Affidavit, #2 Proposed Default Judgment)(Gianetta, Emily)
June 3, 2021 Filing 13 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment (Paine, Matthew)
June 3, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Amazon Seller "eMonkey" (Paine, Matthew)
June 2, 2021 Filing 11 Request for notice of default by Brilliant Home Technology, Inc. . (Gianetta, Emily)
May 11, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Brilliant Home Technology, Inc.. Amazon Seller "eMonkey" served on 5/10/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. Acknowledgement filed by Brilliant Home Technology, Inc.. (Nickerson, Morgan)
May 6, 2021 Filing 9 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE OF PROCESS as to Defendant (Paine, Matthew)
May 5, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE OF PROCESS as to Defendant by Brilliant Home Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Gianetta, Emily)
May 5, 2021 Filing 7 Withdrawal of motion: #6 Affidavit of Service, filed by Brilliant Home Technology, Inc... (Gianetta, Emily)
April 28, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Brilliant Home Technology, Inc.. Amazon Seller "eMonkey" served on 4/27/2021, answer due 5/18/2021. Acknowledgement filed by Brilliant Home Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FedEx Delivery Confirmation)(Gianetta, Emily)
April 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan T. Nickerson on behalf of Brilliant Home Technology, Inc. (Nickerson, Morgan)
April 20, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle)
April 20, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Gianetta, Emily)
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amazon Seller "eMonkey" Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8734600 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Brilliant Home Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Gianetta, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brilliant Home Technology, Inc. v. Amazon Seller "eMonkey"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Seller "eMonkey"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brilliant Home Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Emily E. Gianetta
Represented By: Morgan T. Nickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?