V.U.C. et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: P. C. C. and V. U. C.
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Acting Associate Dir Connie Nolan, Dir. Neb. Serv. Ctr. William Connor, Secretary, DHS Alejandro Mayorkas, Senior Official Tracy Renaud and Dir. Vt. Serv. Ctr. Michael Paul
Case Number: 1:2021cv10652
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Filing 21 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #20 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Pacho, Arnold)
June 17, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages UNOPPOSED by William Connor, Alejandro Mayorkas, Connie Nolan, Michael Paul, Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Brizius, Erin)
May 19, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance. Attorney Abigail Rosenfeld terminated. (Pacho, Arnold)
May 19, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance. Attorney Daniel Basuk terminated. (Pacho, Arnold)
May 18, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by V. U. C., P. C. C. Served on 4/22/2021, answer due 6/21/2021. (Pacho, Arnold)
May 17, 2021 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by V. U. C., P. C. C.. All Defendants. Acknowledgement filed by V. U. C., P. C. C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Parikh, Reena)
May 6, 2021 Filing 15 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. PROTECTIVE ORDER. (RGS, law1)
May 5, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation For Entry of Protective Order by P. C. C., V. U. C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information)(Parikh, Reena)
May 4, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin E. Brizius on behalf of William Connor, Alejandro Mayorkas, Connie Nolan, Michael Paul, Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Brizius, Erin)
April 26, 2021 Filing 11 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Counsel is directed to file an unredacted copy of the complaint with the plaintiffs' full name to be filed under seal. (Pacho, Arnold)
April 22, 2021 Filing 10 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion For Leave to Appear as Supervised Law Students. Daniel Basuk and Abigail Rosenfeld added. (Pacho, Arnold)
April 22, 2021 Filing 9 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion For Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms. (Pacho, Arnold)
April 21, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION For Leave to Appear as Supervised Law Students (Unopposed) filed by P. C. C., V. U. C.. (Attachments: #1 Law Student Certification Form For Daniel Basuk, #2 Law Student Certification Form For Abigail Rosenfeld)(Parikh, Reena)
April 21, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re #6 MOTION For Leave to Appear as Supervised Law Students (Unopposed) by Reena Parikh on behalf of V. U. C., P. C. C. filed by on behalf of V. U. C., P. C. C.. (Parikh, Reena)
April 21, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION For Leave to Appear as Supervised Law Students (Unopposed) by P. C. C., V. U. C..(Parikh, Reena)
April 21, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION For Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms (Unopposed) filed by P. C. C., V. U. C.. (Parikh, Reena)
April 21, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION For Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms (Unopposed) by P. C. C., V. U. C.. (Attachments: #1 Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a)(2))(Parikh, Reena)
April 20, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley)
April 20, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8734811 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by P. C. C., V. U. C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Parikh, Reena)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: V.U.C. et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Erin E. Brizius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Associate Dir Connie Nolan
Represented By: Erin E. Brizius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dir. Neb. Serv. Ctr. William Connor
Represented By: Erin E. Brizius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, DHS Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Erin E. Brizius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senior Official Tracy Renaud
Represented By: Erin E. Brizius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dir. Vt. Serv. Ctr. Michael Paul
Represented By: Erin E. Brizius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P. C. C.
Represented By: Reena Parikh
Represented By: Abigail Rosenfeld
Represented By: Daniel Basuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V. U. C.
Represented By: Reena Parikh
Represented By: Abigail Rosenfeld
Represented By: Daniel Basuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?