Austin v. United States of America
Petitioner: Keith Austin
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv10656
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Donald L Cabell
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2021 Filing 9 Electronic notice to counsel: This civil action has been transferred to the Western District of Missouri and assigned civil case number 6:21-cv-03139. (Danieli, Chris)
June 2, 2021 Filing 8 Case transferred to to District of Western District of Missouri. (Russo, Noreen)
May 13, 2021 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER FOR TRANSFER entered. 1.The Court orders that this action be transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri.2.The Clerk shall take no action with respect to this order until 15 days from the date this order is docketed. In the event that, within such 15-day period, the plaintiff files objections to this order, the case shall be reassigned to a District Judge and the Clerk shall take no action on this order until the matter is decided by the District Judge. (PSSA, 4)
May 12, 2021 Filing 6 Letter/request (non-motion) from Keith Austin. (Russo, Noreen)
May 11, 2021 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT by United States of America. (Brizius, Erin)
May 11, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin E. Brizius on behalf of United States of America (Brizius, Erin)
May 10, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered. 1.The petitioner shall file, within 35 days of the date of this Order, a statement that identifies the statutory basis for his commitment and the court that ordered his commitment.2.The Clerk shall serve a copy of this order on the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts, and said United States Attorney is invited, but not required, to provide a status report concerning petitioners commitment, under seal if necessary.3.Failure of the petitioner to timely comply may result in dismissal of this action. (PSSA, 4)
April 20, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for 18 U.S.C. 4247 by Keith Austin.(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Austin v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Keith Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Erin E. Brizius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?