Wickberg v. AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: Eric D Wickberg
Defendant: AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2021cv10663
Filed: April 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2021 Filing 19 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Further Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Remand by Eric D Wickberg.(Ginsburg, Matthew)
June 11, 2021 Filing 18 Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court of Plaintiff filed by AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Reilly, Christopher)
June 4, 2021 Filing 17 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 (Assented-to) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Response due by 6/11/2021 (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
June 1, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(Reilly, Christopher)
May 26, 2021 Filing 15 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time (Urso, Lisa)
May 21, 2021 Filing 14 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 14 days following ruling on Motion for Remand to File an opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Eric D Wickberg.(Ginsburg, Matthew)
May 18, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court of Plaintiff filed by Eric D Wickberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - NAIC 2020 Market Share Report)(Ginsburg, Matthew)
May 18, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court of Plaintiff by Eric D Wickberg.(Ginsburg, Matthew)
May 13, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Antonellis on behalf of AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Antonellis, Anthony)
May 12, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Errata Exhibit 4)(Reilly, Christopher)
May 12, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(Reilly, Christopher)
May 12, 2021 Filing 8 STATE COURT Record. (Reilly, Christopher)
April 27, 2021 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to May 12, 2021 to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(Reilly, Christopher)
April 23, 2021 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email.(Burgos, Sandra)
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
April 21, 2021 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Category Form4-4-11)(Reilly, Christopher)
April 21, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Civil Cover Sheet and a Local Category Form. The forms can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents - Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet. (Burgos, Sandra)
April 21, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Reilly, Christopher)
April 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8738497 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Reilly, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wickberg v. AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric D Wickberg
Represented By: Matthew J. Ginsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Christopher M. Reilly
Represented By: Anthony J. Antonellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?