Dr. Dennis Gross Skincare LLC v. Specialty Skincare, LLC
Plaintiff: Dr. Dennis Gross Skincare LLC
Defendant: Specialty Skincare, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv10677
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Specialty Skincare, LLC by Dr. Dennis Gross Skincare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Counsel, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nickerson, Morgan)
May 25, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by Dr. Dennis Gross Skincare LLC OF DISMISSAL OF COUNT II & COUNT III ONLY (Nickerson, Morgan)
May 24, 2021 Filing 8 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment (Paine, Matthew)
May 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Specialty Skincare, LLC (Paine, Matthew)
May 24, 2021 Filing 6 Request for notice of default by Dr. Dennis Gross Skincare LLC . (Nickerson, Morgan)
May 3, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Dr. Dennis Gross Skincare LLC. Specialty Skincare, LLC served on 4/28/2021, answer due 5/19/2021. Acknowledgement filed by Dr. Dennis Gross Skincare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Brodsky, Jack)
April 23, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Specialty Skincare, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Baker, Casey)
April 23, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Baker, Casey)
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Specialty Skincare, LLC Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8740808 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Dr. Dennis Gross Skincare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, # 3 Form AO120 - removed and refiled as a separate docket entry, see dkt. no. #2 )(Nickerson, Morgan) Modified on 4/23/2021 (Baker, Casey).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dr. Dennis Gross Skincare LLC v. Specialty Skincare, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Dennis Gross Skincare LLC
Represented By: Morgan T. Nickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialty Skincare, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?