Cybersoft IP, LLC v. Kaspersky Lab, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cybersoft IP, LLC
Defendant: Kaspersky Lab, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv10704
Filed: April 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Marianne B Bowler
Referring Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case RE-Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
June 23, 2021 Filing 24 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. re #21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to 07/27/2021 to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cybersoft IP, LLC (Putnam, Harold)
June 23, 2021 Filing 23 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (Bowler, Marianne)
June 22, 2021 Filing 22 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to 07/20/2021 to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss UNOPPOSED by Cybersoft IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ramey, William)
June 21, 2021 Filing 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to 07/27/2021 to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss by Cybersoft IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ramey, William)
June 21, 2021 Filing 20 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Ramey, William)
June 18, 2021 Filing 19 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Bowler, Marianne)
June 17, 2021 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING; Scheduling Conference set for 6/21/2021 12:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. ALL COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO APPEAR BY PHONE by calling 888-675-2535 approximately five minutes prior to the conference, using Access Code 6641794. If, for some reason, the call is disconnected, dial back in. NOTE that yours may not be the first case called, but please remain on the line until it is.(Belpedio, Lisa)
June 17, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Eric H. Chadwick Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8825409 by Kaspersky Lab, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cloherty, Daniel)
June 15, 2021 Filing 16 DECLARATION re #14 MOTION for Judicial Notice by Kaspersky Lab, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Cloherty, Daniel)
June 15, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION for Judicial Notice filed by Kaspersky Lab, Inc.. (Cloherty, Daniel)
June 15, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Judicial Notice by Kaspersky Lab, Inc..(Cloherty, Daniel)
June 15, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kaspersky Lab, Inc.. (Cloherty, Daniel)
June 15, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Kaspersky Lab, Inc..(Cloherty, Daniel)
June 15, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kaspersky Lab, Inc.. (Cloherty, Daniel)
June 15, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Cloherty on behalf of Kaspersky Lab, Inc. (Cloherty, Daniel)
May 21, 2021 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Bowler, Marianne)
May 20, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of William P. Ramey, III Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8785666 by Cybersoft IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of William P. Ramey, III in Support, #2 Letters of Good Standing)(Weaver, Michaela)
May 9, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 6/18/2021 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. ALL COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO APPEAR BY PHONE by calling 888-675-2535 approximately five minutes prior to the conference, using Access Code 6641794. If, for some reason, the call is disconnected, dial back in. NOTE that yours may not be the first case called, but please remain on the line until it is.(Putnam, Harold)
April 28, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Kaspersky Lab, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
April 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Danieli, Chris)
April 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Martin on behalf of Cybersoft IP, LLC (Martin, John)
April 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michaela M. Weaver on behalf of Cybersoft IP, LLC (Weaver, Michaela)
April 28, 2021 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Weaver, Michaela)
April 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kaspersky Lab, Inc. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8748476 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Cybersoft IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Category Form)(Weaver, Michaela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cybersoft IP, LLC v. Kaspersky Lab, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaspersky Lab, Inc.
Represented By: Eric H. Chadwick
Represented By: Daniel J. Cloherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cybersoft IP, LLC
Represented By: Michaela M. Weaver
Represented By: John T. Martin
Represented By: William P. Ramey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?