Moscoso Mejia v. McCleary et al
Plaintiff: Juan Camilo Moscoso Mejia
Defendant: ACT DIR USCIS Tracy RENAUD, District Director Michael J McCleary, Merrick Garland, Acting Secretary of Alejandro Mayorkas, Michael J McCleary, Alejandro Mayorkas and Tracy RENAUD
Case Number: 1:2021cv10757
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Filing 6 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint; All Defendants' answers due on or before 9/13/2021. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
May 27, 2021 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION to Continue time to respond to Plaintiffs complaint to September 13, 2021 by Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Michael J McCleary, Tracy RENAUD.(Farquhar, Rayford) Modified on 6/1/2021 to Correct CM/ECF Filing Event As Counsel Filed the Motion Under the Wrong Event in CM/ECF (Paine, Matthew).
May 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Rayford A. Farquhar on behalf of Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Michael J McCleary, Tracy RENAUD (Farquhar, Rayford)
May 10, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
May 10, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND REVIEW OF AGENCY DECISION UNDER THE ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEDURES ACT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8764986 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Juan Camilo Moscoso Mejia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rado, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moscoso Mejia v. McCleary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Camilo Moscoso Mejia
Represented By: Rachel L. Rado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACT DIR USCIS Tracy RENAUD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Director Michael J McCleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary of Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J McCleary
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy RENAUD
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?