Fidalgo v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Vaz, Alex Fidalgo and Alex Fidalgo Vaz
Defendant: Joseph Biden, United States of America and Commonwealth
Case Number: 1:2021cv10795
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Filing 10 EXHIBIT 9 by Alex Fidalgo Vaz. (Paine, Matthew)
July 1, 2021 Filing 9 EXHIBIT 8 by Alex Fidalgo Vaz. (Paine, Matthew)
July 1, 2021 Filing 8 EXHIBIT 7 by Alex Fidalgo Vaz. (Paine, Matthew)
June 28, 2021 Filing 7 EXHIBIT 6 by Alex Fidalgo Vaz. (Paine, Matthew)
June 2, 2021 Filing 6 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(PSSA, 4)
June 2, 2021 Filing 5 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER1.This action is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h)(3) for lack of subject matter jurisdiction.2.In view of the dismissal of this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, no action will be taken on plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis.3.The Clerk shall enter a separate order of dismissal.(PSSA, 4)
May 24, 2021 Filing 4 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint, by Alex Fidalgo Vaz. (Paine, Matthew)
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alex Fidalgo.(Castilla, Francis)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Alex Fidalgo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fidalgo v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Biden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vaz, Alex Fidalgo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Fidalgo Vaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?