ARIAS COCCO v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: JOAQUIN A ARIAS COCCO
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and LAWRENCE GENERAL HOSPITAL
Case Number: 1:2021cv10800
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Filing 12 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer UNITED STATES OF AMERICA answer due 7/23/2021.; granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #10 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 7/23/21 to File Answer Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 7/23/21 to File Response/Reply ( Responses due by 8/6/2021) "Allowed without opposition."(PBS, law1)
June 17, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kanwit, Thomas)
June 17, 2021 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 7/23/21 to File Answer , Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 7/23/21 to File Response/Reply ( Responses due by 7/1/2021) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kanwit, Thomas)
June 17, 2021 Filing 9 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion to ContinueThis hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Scheduling Conference RESET for 8/9/2021 03:30 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Patti B. Saris. Joint Statement to be filed by 8/4/2021. (Baker, Casey)
June 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Allyson L. Gay on behalf of LAWRENCE GENERAL HOSPITAL (Gay, Allyson)
June 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Allyson L. Gay on behalf of LAWRENCE GENERAL HOSPITAL (Gay, Allyson)
June 14, 2021 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION to Continue status conference to August 3, 2021 or thereafter by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Kanwit, Thomas)
June 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing.This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Scheduling Conference set for 6/30/2021 02:30 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Baker, Casey)
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Vieira, Leonardo)
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
May 14, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by LAWRENCE GENERAL HOSPITAL, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Kanwit, Thomas)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LAWRENCE GENERAL HOSPITAL, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Fee Status: US Government) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category sheet, #3 Exhibit)(Kanwit, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ARIAS COCCO v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOAQUIN A ARIAS COCCO
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Mulvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAWRENCE GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Represented By: Allyson L. Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?