Collins v. Victory Chimes, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christopher Collins
Defendant: Victory Chimes, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv10901
Filed: June 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Judith G Dein
Referring Judge: Mark L Wolf
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 688
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2021 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Victory Chimes, Inc.. (Blatchley, Samuel)
July 13, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Victory Chimes, Inc.. (Blatchley, Samuel)
July 12, 2021 Filing 15 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held by video conference before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: the clerk gives notice of prohibition on broadcasting, photographing, or recording of the court proceeding; case called; Scheduling Conference held on 7/12/2021; counsel report case type and scope of discovery required; USMJ Dein adopts the proposed discovery schedule and sets next conference for 1/13/22 @ 10:00am. (Court Reporter: James Gibbons at jamesgibbonsrpr@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Gilzean and Blatchley) (Quinn, Thomas)
July 12, 2021 Filing 14 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Following the initial scheduling conference held in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P.16(b) and Local Rule 16.1, it is hereby ORDERED: Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2021, All Discovery to be completed by 4/15/2022, and Dispositive Motions due by 5/15/2022.STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/13/2022 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. The parties shall submit a brief joint statement no later than three days before the Conference addressing the status of the case, scheduling for the remainder of the case through trial and the use of alternative dispute resolution programs. With respect to the use of ADR, the parties shall indicate whether an agreement has been reached, but shall not identify their respective positions.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
July 1, 2021 Filing 13 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Gilzean, Jonathan)
July 1, 2021 Filing 12 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Gilzean, Jonathan)
July 1, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Christopher Collins.(Gilzean, Jonathan)
June 11, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn M. Latti on behalf of Christopher Collins (Latti, Carolyn)
June 9, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET FOR 7/12/2021 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
June 4, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand (preserving the Limitation rights to be decided by USDC Maine) by Victory Chimes, Inc..(Blatchley, Samuel)
June 4, 2021 Filing 7 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. Referred for: Full Pretrial, Dispositive Motions (ptd), Report and Recommendations. (Loret, Magdalena)
June 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis X. Downey on behalf of Victory Chimes, Inc. (Downey, Francis)
June 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Murphy on behalf of Victory Chimes, Inc. (Murphy, Robert)
June 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel P. Blatchley on behalf of Victory Chimes, Inc. (Blatchley, Samuel)
June 1, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Victory Chimes, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
June 1, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Victory Chimes, Inc. (Fee Status: Seaman), filed by Christopher Collins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Category Sheet, #3 Affidavit Seaman's Declaration)(Gilzean, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Victory Chimes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Collins
Represented By: Jonathan E. Gilzean
Represented By: Carolyn M. Latti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victory Chimes, Inc.
Represented By: Robert J. Murphy
Represented By: Samuel P. Blatchley
Represented By: Francis X. Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?