Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Omega Flex, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Omega Flex, Inc. and Dormont Manufacturing Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv10917
Filed: June 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2021 Filing 15 Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand Based on Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Omega Flex, Inc.. (Howe, Christopher)
July 8, 2021 Filing 14 Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand filed by Dormont Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Nicole Solomon)(Giroux, Jared)
June 25, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Remand filed by Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Business Entity Detail)(Dildine, Scott)
June 25, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company.(Dildine, Scott)
June 15, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dormont Manufacturing Company. (Giroux, Jared)
June 15, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Dormont Manufacturing Company.(Giroux, Jared)
June 14, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Omega Flex, Inc..(Howe, Christopher)
June 10, 2021 Filing 8 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Omega Flex, Inc. answer due 6/16/2021. (Vieira, Leonardo)
June 9, 2021 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 16, 2021 to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Omega Flex, Inc..(Howe, Christopher)
June 9, 2021 Filing 6 STATE COURT Record. (Howe, Christopher)
June 3, 2021 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Currie, Haley)
June 3, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
June 2, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Omega Flex, Inc.. (Howe, Christopher)
June 2, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Robert Howe on behalf of Omega Flex, Inc. (Howe, Christopher)
June 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Omega Flex, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8802584 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Notice of Service, #3 Exhibit C-Dormont Consent to Removal, #4 Category Form, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet Federal)(Howe, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Omega Flex, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott L. Dildine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omega Flex, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Robert Howe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dormont Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Jared B. Giroux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?