Mooring v. Helen H Offshore Fishing Corp.
Plaintiff: Robert Mooring, Jr.
Defendant: Helen H Offshore Fishing Corp.
Case Number: 1:2021cv10925
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULINGThis hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/2021 12:45 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Denise J. Casper. NOTE TIME CHANGE ONLY(Hourihan, Lisa)
July 19, 2021 Filing 11 Judge Denise J. Casper: Standing Order Regarding Appearance of Counsel Via Telephone or Videoconference (Hourihan, Lisa)
July 19, 2021 Filing 10 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. Standing Order Re: Courtroom Opportunities for Relatively Inexperienced Attorneys(Hourihan, Lisa)
July 19, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Scheduling ConferenceThis hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/2021 03:30 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
July 16, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Helen H Offshore Fishing Corp..(Blatchley, Samuel)
July 1, 2021 Filing 7 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint Helen H Offshore Fishing Corp. answer due 7/16/2021. (Hourihan, Lisa)
June 30, 2021 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 16, 2021 to File Answer by Helen H Offshore Fishing Corp..(Blatchley, Samuel)
June 24, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Murphy on behalf of Helen H Offshore Fishing Corp. (Murphy, Robert)
June 24, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel P. Blatchley on behalf of Helen H Offshore Fishing Corp. (Blatchley, Samuel)
June 3, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Helen H Offshore Fishing Corp.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley)
June 3, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Helen H Offshore Fishing Corp. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8803863 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Robert Mooring. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Bond, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mooring v. Helen H Offshore Fishing Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen H Offshore Fishing Corp.
Represented By: Robert J. Murphy
Represented By: Samuel P. Blatchley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Mooring, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas M. Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?