SAYED v. Military Sealift Command
Plaintiff: WALEED SAYED and Military Sealift Command
Case Number: 1:2021cv10947
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing: In light of the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #10 , the Scheduling Conference set for 8/17/2021 is canceled. (Kelly, Danielle)
July 23, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by WALEED SAYED (Bingham, Neal)
July 21, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference; SEE attached Notice. Scheduling Conference set for 8/17/2021 02:30 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Indira Talwani.This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (MacDonald, Gail)
July 20, 2021 Filing 8 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting Defendant's assented-to Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #7 . Defendant's time to shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is extended until August 21, 2021. (Kelly, Danielle)
July 16, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Military Sealift Command.(Poswistilo, Susan)
July 9, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WALEED SAYED. (Bingham, Neal)
July 9, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by WALEED SAYED re #4 Affidavit of Service, . (Bingham, Neal)
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by WALEED SAYED. Military Sealift Command served on 6/22/2021, answer due 7/13/2021. Acknowledgement filed by WALEED SAYED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Bingham, Neal)
June 7, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle)
June 7, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
June 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Military Sealift Command Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8806667 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by WALEED SAYED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Supplement Category Sheet)(Bingham, Neal) Modified on 6/7/2021: Corrected filing party (Kelly, Danielle).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAYED v. Military Sealift Command
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WALEED SAYED
Represented By: Neal James Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Military Sealift Command
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?