Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH et al v. Eli Lilly and Company
Plaintiff: Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Defendant: Eli Lilly and Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv10954
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Filing 13 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to August 27, 2021 to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,,, Or Otherwise Respond AND Set Deadline for Plaintiffs Response. Eli Lilly and Company answer due 8/27/2021. (Folan, Karen)
June 18, 2021 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to August 27, 2021 to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, Or Otherwise Respond AND Set Deadline for Plaintiffs Response by Eli Lilly and Company.(Martin, Andrea)
June 14, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea L. Martin on behalf of Eli Lilly and Company (Martin, Andrea)
June 9, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Eli Lilly and Company served on 6/8/2021, answer due 6/29/2021. (Blais, Elaine)
June 8, 2021 Filing 9 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Blais, Elaine)
June 8, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
June 8, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
June 8, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc... (Blais, Elaine)
June 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Grammel on behalf of Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Grammel, Molly)
June 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas J. Kline on behalf of Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Kline, Douglas)
June 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Frederickson, III on behalf of Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Frederickson, Robert)
June 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Elaine Herrmann Blais on behalf of Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Blais, Elaine)
June 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eli Lilly and Company Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8809234 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Errata 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Exhibit 39, #42 Exhibit 40, #43 Exhibit 41, #44 Exhibit 42, #45 Exhibit 43, #46 Exhibit 44, #47 Exhibit 45, #48 Exhibit 46, #49 Exhibit 47, #50 Exhibit 48)(Blais, Elaine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH et al v. Eli Lilly and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH
Represented By: Molly Grammel
Represented By: Elaine Herrmann Blais
Represented By: Robert Frederickson, III
Represented By: Douglas J. Kline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Molly Grammel
Represented By: Elaine Herrmann Blais
Represented By: Robert Frederickson, III
Represented By: Douglas J. Kline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Lilly and Company
Represented By: Andrea L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?