Trejo v. Sea Harvest, Inc.
Plaintiff: Aaron Trejo
Defendant: Sea Harvest, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv10978
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Transfer Case or Alternatively, to Dismiss Plaintiff's Action and Compel Arbitration to New Jersey. filed by Aaron Trejo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Shaffer, Matthew)
July 26, 2021 Filing 14 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Matthew D. Shaffer. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
July 26, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Matthew D. Shaffer Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8874073 by Aaron Trejo. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Latti, Carolyn)
July 23, 2021 Filing 12 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to August 2, 2021 to file Response to Defendant's Motion to Transfer, or In the Alternatively to Dismiss Plaintiff's Action and Compel Arbitration. (McDonagh, Christina)
July 22, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to August 2, 2021 to file Respond to Defendant's #6 Motion to Transfer, or In the Alternatively to Dismiss Plaintiff's Action and Compel Arbitration by Aaron Trejo. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Latti, Carolyn) Modified on 7/23/2021 to correct docket text (McDonagh, Christina).
July 15, 2021 Filing 10 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Brian McEwing. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
July 15, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Brian McEwing Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8859851 by Sea Harvest, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Muzyka, Thomas)
July 14, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re #6 MOTION to Transfer Case or Alternatively, to Dismiss Plaintiff's Action and Compel Arbitration to New Jersey. by John J. Bromley on behalf of Sea Harvest, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1; Email dated July 9, 2021)(Bromley, John)
July 12, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Transfer Case or Alternatively, to Dismiss Plaintiff's Action and Compel Arbitration to New Jersey. filed by Sea Harvest, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Muzyka, Thomas)
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Transfer Case or Alternatively, to Dismiss Plaintiff's Action and Compel Arbitration to New Jersey. by Sea Harvest, Inc..(Muzyka, Thomas)
July 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Bromley on behalf of Sea Harvest, Inc. (Bromley, John)
July 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J Muzyka on behalf of Sea Harvest, Inc. (Muzyka, Thomas)
June 11, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sea Harvest, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
June 11, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
June 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Sea Harvest, Inc. (Fee Status: Seaman), filed by Aaron Trejo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category sheet, #3 Seaman's Declaration)(Latti, Carolyn) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/11/2021) (Pacho, Arnold). Modified on 6/11/2021 to attach complaint. (Pacho, Arnold).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trejo v. Sea Harvest, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sea Harvest, Inc.
Represented By: Brian McEwing
Represented By: John J. Bromley
Represented By: Thomas J Muzyka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Trejo
Represented By: Carolyn M. Latti
Represented By: Matthew D Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?