Duffy Archive Limited v. Gilt Groupe, LP
Plaintiff: Duffy Archive Limited
Defendant: Gilt Groupe, LP
Case Number: 1:2021cv10997
Filed: June 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2021 Filing 8 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Gilt Groupe, LP answer due 8/22/2021. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
July 8, 2021 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 8/22/2021 to File Answer by Duffy Archive Limited.(Parker, Robert)
June 29, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Gilt Groupe, LP served on 6/17/2021, answer due 7/8/2021. (Parker, Robert)
June 15, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Gilt Groupe, LP. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
June 15, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
June 15, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Duffy Archive Limited. (Parker, Robert)
June 15, 2021 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case . (Parker, Robert)
June 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and jury demand against Gilt Groupe, LP Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8821964 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Duffy Archive Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Original Image, #2 Exhibit B- USCO Certificate, #3 Exhibit C- Screenshots, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parker, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duffy Archive Limited v. Gilt Groupe, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duffy Archive Limited
Represented By: Robert Terry Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilt Groupe, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?