LeMaitre Vascular Inc. v. Leagans
Plaintiff: LeMaitre Vascular Inc.
Defendant: Lawrence Leagans
Case Number: 1:2021cv11012
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Jennifer C Boal
Referring Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay or Transfer the Case filed by Lawrence Leagans. (Miller, Shea)
August 13, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay or Transfer the Case by Lawrence Leagans.(Miller, Shea)
August 12, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #8 Emergency MOTION for Discovery Limited Expedited. A Motion Hearing is set for September 15, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. by Remote Proceeding at Boston before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (York, Steve)
August 12, 2021 Filing 10 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal Referred for: Events Only (e). Motions referred: #8 Emergency MOTION for Discovery Limited Expedited. (Lima, Christine) Motions referred to Jennifer C. Boal.
August 11, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 Emergency MOTION for Discovery Limited Expedited filed by LeMaitre Vascular Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Winton, Erik)
August 11, 2021 Filing 8 Emergency MOTION for Discovery Limited Expedited by LeMaitre Vascular Inc..(Winton, Erik)
August 3, 2021 Filing 7 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added William H. Foster and Katie E. Towery. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Warnock, Douglas)
August 2, 2021 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of William H. Foster and Katie E. Towery Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-8883511 by Lawrence Leagans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of William H. Foster, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Katie E. Towery)(Miller, Shea)
July 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik J. Winton on behalf of LeMaitre Vascular Inc. (Winton, Erik)
July 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Shea A. Miller on behalf of Lawrence Leagans (Miller, Shea)
June 21, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lawrence Leagans Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8825874 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by LeMaitre Vascular Inc..(Lovejoy, Sarah) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/21/2021: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form) (Kelly, Danielle). (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/21/2021) (Kelly, Danielle).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LeMaitre Vascular Inc. v. Leagans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LeMaitre Vascular Inc.
Represented By: Sarah E. Lovejoy
Represented By: Erik J. Winton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Leagans
Represented By: Katie E. Towery
Represented By: Shea A. Miller
Represented By: William H. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?