English v. M/V Vineyard Lady et al
Plaintiff: Evelyn English
Defendant: Hyannis Harbor Tours, Inc., Hy-Line Ferry, M/V Vineyard Lady and Hyannis Harbor Tours, Inc. doing business as Hy-Line Cruises and/or Hy-Line Ferry
Case Number: 1:2021cv11030
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Evelyn English. M/V Vineyard Lady served on 8/4/2021, answer due 8/25/2021. Acknowledgment filed by Evelyn English. (Orlando, Joseph)
July 28, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Evelyn English. Hyannis Harbor Tours, Inc. waiver sent on 7/26/2021, answer due 9/24/2021. (Orlando, Joseph)
July 26, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Murphy on behalf of Hyannis Harbor Tours, Inc. (Murphy, Robert)
July 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel P. Blatchley on behalf of Hyannis Harbor Tours, Inc. (Blatchley, Samuel)
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle)
June 22, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Trial Demand against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8828381 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Evelyn English. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Orlando, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: English v. M/V Vineyard Lady et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyannis Harbor Tours, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hy-Line Ferry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Vineyard Lady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyannis Harbor Tours, Inc. doing business as Hy-Line Cruises and/or Hy-Line Ferry
Represented By: Robert J. Murphy
Represented By: Samuel P. Blatchley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn English
Represented By: Joseph M. Orlando, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?