Piccirilli V. Town of Halifax et al
Plaintiff: Robert Piccirilli
Defendant: Town of Halifax, Ashley DiSesa, Gordon C Andrews and Halifax Board of Selectmen
Case Number: 1:2021cv11039
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Robert Piccirilli (Day, John)
July 27, 2021 Filing 21 STATUS REPORT Concerning Appointment of Building Commissioner by Gordon C Andrews, Ashley DiSesa, Halifax Board of Selectmen, Town of Halifax. (Cloherty, John)
July 22, 2021 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert Piccirilli. Ashley DiSesa waiver sent on 7/7/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Day, John)
July 22, 2021 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert Piccirilli. Gordon C Andrews waiver sent on 7/7/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Day, John)
July 22, 2021 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert Piccirilli. Halifax Board of Selectmen waiver sent on 7/7/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Day, John)
July 22, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert Piccirilli. Town of Halifax waiver sent on 7/7/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Day, John)
July 19, 2021 Filing 16 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. Piccirilli's motion for a preliminary injunction, [ECF No. #2 ], and Andrews' special motion to dismiss, [ECF No. #12 ], are DENIED. The parties are ordered to file a status report within ten (10) days of the appointment of anyone to the Building Commissioner position. SO ORDERED.(McDonagh, Christina)
July 13, 2021 Filing 15 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Motion Hearing held on 7/13/2021. Oral arguments by the parties. Court takes matter under advisement. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Day, Cloherty) (Folan, Karen)
July 12, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Robert Piccirilli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Barbara Gaynor)(Day, John)
July 6, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Gordon C Andrews, Ashley DiSesa, Halifax Board of Selectmen, Town of Halifax. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Seelig Affidavit)(Cloherty, John)
July 6, 2021 Filing 12 Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Gordon C Andrews, Ashley DiSesa, Halifax Board of Selectmen, Town of Halifax. (Cloherty, John)
July 2, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. NOTICE IS FOR TIME CHANGE ONLY. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.Motion Hearing reset for 7/13/2021 02:30 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. (Folan, Karen)
June 23, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Davis on behalf of Gordon C Andrews, Ashley DiSesa, Halifax Board of Selectmen, Town of Halifax (Davis, John)
June 23, 2021 Filing 9 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Telephone Conference held on 6/23/2021. Defendant will file response to motion for TRO by 7/6/21, plaintiff's reply due by 7/12/21. Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2021 02:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Parties will let the court know if they would like the hearing in person or by video. Status conference originally set for 6/28/21 is canceled. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Day, Davis, Cloherty, Mayo) (Folan, Karen)
June 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Cloherty, III on behalf of Gordon C Andrews, Ashley DiSesa, Halifax Board of Selectmen, Town of Halifax (Cloherty, John)
June 23, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Telephone Conference set for 6/23/2021 02:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Plaintiff's counsel shall give notice of the hearing to defendant.(Folan, Karen)
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 6/28/2021 11:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. (Folan, Karen)
June 23, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Robert Piccirilli. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Plaintiff in Support of Motion for TRO)(Day, John)
June 22, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Robert Piccirilli.(Day, John)
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8830524 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Robert Piccirilli. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Category Form)(Day, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Piccirilli V. Town of Halifax et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Halifax
Represented By: John J. Cloherty, III
Represented By: John J. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley DiSesa
Represented By: John J. Cloherty, III
Represented By: John J. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon C Andrews
Represented By: John J. Cloherty, III
Represented By: John J. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halifax Board of Selectmen
Represented By: John J. Cloherty, III
Represented By: John J. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Piccirilli
Represented By: John S. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?