Doelger et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Peter Doelger and Yoon Doelger
Defendant: Chickasaw Capital Management, LLC and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2021cv11042
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Freniere on behalf of Chickasaw Capital Management, LLC (Freniere, David)
August 13, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. of Intent to Oppose Impending Pro Hac Vice Motion (Lukey, Joan)
August 12, 2021 Filing 8 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Ryan R. Baker. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
August 12, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ryan R. Baker Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8900870 by Chickasaw Capital Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Mtn Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Fuller, Steven)
August 4, 2021 Filing 6 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to 9/24/21 to File Responses to Complaint (Folan, Karen)
August 4, 2021 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 9/24/21 to File Responses to Complaint by Chickasaw Capital Management, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Lukey, Joan)
August 3, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven N. Fuller on behalf of Chickasaw Capital Management, LLC (Fuller, Steven)
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Chickasaw Capital Management, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8831632 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Peter Doelger, Yoon Doelger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Category Sheet)(Gardner, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doelger et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chickasaw Capital Management, LLC
Represented By: Ryan R. Baker
Represented By: David J. Freniere
Represented By: Steven N. Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Joan A. Lukey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Doelger
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yoon Doelger
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?