Saini v. Singh
Plaintiff: Mohan S. Saini
Defendant: Parmjit Singh
Case Number: 1:2021cv11044
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Filing 6 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Answer due on August 27, 2021. (PBS, law6)
July 21, 2021 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Parmjit Singh.(Brennan, Ann)
July 15, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Parmjit Singh served on 7/8/2021, answer due 7/29/2021. (Van Dam, Michael)
June 24, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Parmjit Singh. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley)
June 24, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Parmjit Singh Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8832875 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Mohan S. Saini. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Van Dam, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saini v. Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parmjit Singh
Represented By: Ann Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohan S. Saini
Represented By: Michael Van Dam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?